Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163050

EP1163050 - PREPARATION OF POROUS INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID PARTICLES FOR CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/51]POROUS INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID PARTICLES FOR CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATIONS AND PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION
[2006/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waters Investments Limited
34 Maple Street
Milford, MA 01757 / US
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / FISK, Raymond, P.
13 Creastwood Drive
Norton, MA 02766 / US
02 / WALTER, Thomas, H.
54 Indian Brook Road
Ashland, MA 01721 / US
03 / ZHIPING, Jiang
5 Sweetwood Circle
Westford, MA 01886 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Vossius, Corinna , et al
Corinna Vossius IP Group
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Widenmayerstrasse 43
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Vossius, Corinna , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00907186.104.02.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US03052
Priority number, dateUS1999024479505.02.1999         Original published format: US 244795
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0045951
Date:10.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163050
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1163050
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.08.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:B01J21/06, B01J21/08, B01J21/12, B01J31/02, B01J31/06, B05D7/00, B32B5/16, C07F5/06, C07F7/02, C08F4/00, B01J20/10, B01J20/22
[2003/32]
Former International [2001/51]B01J21/06, B01J21/08, B01J21/12, B01J31/02, B01J31/06, B05D7/00, B32B5/16, C07F5/06, C07F7/02, C08F4/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PORÖSEN ANORGANISCH/ORGANISCHEN HYBRIDPARTIKELN ZUR CHROMATOGRAPHISCHEN TRENNUNG[2006/12]
English:PREPARATION OF POROUS INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID PARTICLES FOR CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATIONS[2006/12]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE PARTICULES HYBRIDES POREUSES INORGANIQUES/ORGANIQUES POUR LA SEPARATION EN CHROMATOGRAPHIE[2006/12]
Former [2001/51]PORÖSE ANORGANISCH/ORGANISCHE HYBRIDPARTIKEL ZUR CHROMATOGRAPHISCHEN TRENNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG
Former [2001/51]POROUS INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID PARTICLES FOR CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATIONS AND PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION
Former [2001/51]PARTICULES HYBRIDES POREUSES INORGANIQUES/ORGANIQUES POUR LA SEPARATION EN CHROMATOGRAPHIE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION
Entry into regional phase05.09.2001National basic fee paid 
05.09.2001Search fee paid 
05.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
01.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2006
01.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.06.2006Fee for grant paid
30.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP06014856.6  / EP1733786
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
IT03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
LU04.02.2007
IE05.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
IT03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
IE05.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2008/23]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
IT03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
IE05.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2008/19]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
IE05.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2008/10]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
IE05.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
SE03.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2008/01]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
MC28.02.2007
SE03.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/48]AT03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
MC28.02.2007
SE03.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/46]AT03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/39]CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/37]CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/36]FI03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[XP]US4017528  (UNGER KLAUS, et al);
 [X]US5565142  (DESHPANDE RAVINDRA [US], et al);
 [A]US4724207  (HOU KENNETH C [US], et al);
 [A]US5378790  (MICHALCZYK MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [A]US5637135  (OTTENSTEIN DANIEL M [US], et al);
 [A]US5856379  (SHIRATSUCHI KENTARO [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5965202  (TAYLOR-SMITH RALPH E [US], et al)