EP1158964 - EDIBLE COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 1735 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGELLO, Michael 5 Cross Ridge Circle Marlboro, NJ 17746 / US | 02 /
DELL, Sheila, M. 8 Deer Path Lane New Hope, PA 18938 / US | 03 /
TUASON, Domingo, C. 3607 Sunny Lea Road Bensalem, PA 19020 / US | 04 /
MODLISZEWSKI, James, J. 523 Midwood Drive Brick, NJ 08724-4727 / US | 05 /
RUSZKAY, Thomas, A. 517 Blackbird Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 06 /
WERNER, David, E. 11 Bentley Road West Grove, PA 19390 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00907193.7 | 07.02.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000US03130 | Priority number, date | US19990119005P | 08.02.1999 Original published format: US 119005 P | US19990133092P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133092 P | US19990162514P | 29.10.1999 Original published format: US 162514 P | US19990167407P | 24.11.1999 Original published format: US 167407 P | US19990172526P | 17.12.1999 Original published format: US 172526 P | US20000491724 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: US 491724 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0045794 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1158964 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1158964 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/36, A61K9/28, A61K9/32 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/2866 (EP,KR,US);
C08L1/02 (KR);
A61K9/284 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/286 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08L71/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ESSBARES ÜBERZUGSMITTEL | [2001/49] | English: | EDIBLE COATING COMPOSITION | [2001/49] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENROBAGE COMESTIBLE | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 09.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04075509.2 / EP1430889 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | FI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 07.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0627173 (GIULIANI SPA [IT]) [X] 1-5,19,20,25,28,29,40-42 * page 3, line 41; claims 3,4 *; | [A]US5840332 (LERNER E ITZHAK [IL], et al); | [A] - PICKER K M, "The use of carrageenan in mixture with microcrystalline cellulose and its functionality for making tablets", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990701), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 27 - 36, XP004257087 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(99)00009-0 | International search | [X]US4784858 (VENTOURAS KIMON [CH]); | [X]US5023083 (DRELL WILLIAM [US]); | [X]US5514435 (SUZUKI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) |