Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159010

EP1159010 - TREATMENT OF DIARRHEA CAUSED BY ENTEROPATHOGENIC ESCHERICHIA COLI [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.03.2007  [2007/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Governors of the University of Alberta
222 Campus Towers, 8625 - 112 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
THE GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALBERTA
222 Campus Towers, 8625 - 112 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / VANMAELE, Rosa, P.
683 Romaniuk Road
Edmonton, Alberta T6R 1A4 / CA
02 / ARMSTRONG, Glen, D.
7591 91st Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T6C 1P9 / CA
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Silveston, Judith , et al
ABEL & IMRAY
20 Red Lion Street
London, WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Silveston, Judith , et al
ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street
London, WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date00907382.602.03.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000CA00218
Priority number, dateUS19990123033P04.03.1999         Original published format: US 123033 P
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0051644
Date:08.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159010
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/48, A61K31/7016, A61K31/702, A61P1/12, A61K31/70
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON ENTEROPATHOGENIC ESCHERICHIA COLI INDUZIERTE DIARRHÖEDIARRHÖE[2001/49]
English:TREATMENT OF DIARRHEA CAUSED BY ENTEROPATHOGENIC ESCHERICHIA COLI[2001/49]
French:TRAITEMENT DE LA DIARRHEE PROVOQUEE PAR ESCHERICHIA COLI ENTEROPATHOGENES[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2001National basic fee paid 
04.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
06.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/11]
24.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO0008467  (UNIV ALBERTA [CA]) [PX] 1,2,4-9,11-16,18-20 * page 22, lines 10-20 * * page 28, line 23 - page 30, line 24 * * page 35, lines 1-12; claims 1-14,20 *;
 [XY]JPH10330267  ;
 [Y]WO9521628  (ALBERTA RES COUNCIL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 23, lines 5-20; claim -; table 1 *;
 [A]WO9749431  (SYNSORB BIOTECH INC [CA]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9639189  (SYNSORB BIOTECH INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [PX]  - VANMAELE, ROSA P. ET AL, "Role of lactosyl glycan sequences in inhibiting enteropathogenic Escherichia coli attachment.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (JULY, 1999) VOL. 67, NO. 7, PP. 3302-3307., XP000929525 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - VANMAELE, R. P. (1) ET AL, "Role of lactosyl glycan sequences in inhibiting enteropathogenic Escherichia coli attachment.", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, (1999) VOL. 99, PP. 43. MEETING INFO.: 99TH GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY CHICAGO, ILLINOIS, USA MAY 30-JUNE 3, 1999 AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLO, XP000929496 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - "Vero toxin neutralizing agent", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1999-100995, XP002144296 & JPH10330267 A 19981215 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 1-21
 [Y]  - HEERZE L D ET AL, "OLIGOSACCHARIDE SEQUENCES ATTACHED TO AN INERT SUPPORT (SYNSORB) AS POTENTIAL THERAPY FOR ANTIBIOTIC-ASSOCIATED DIARRHEA AND PSEUDOMEMBRANOUS COLITIS", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES,US,CHICAGO, IL, (19940601), vol. 169, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 1291 - 1296, XP000573856 [Y] 1-21 * figures 1,2; table 1 *
 [T]  - NIH/PUBMED, "Enteropathogenic Escherichia Coli", NIH/PUBMED INTERNET SITE, (20000308), XP002144295 [T] 1-21 * abstract *