EP1080308 - FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP AND TWO PRESSURE ACCUMULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHR, Bernd Panoramastrasse 83 D-73207 Plochingen / DE | [2001/10] | Application number, filing date | 00907451.9 | 26.01.2000 | [2001/10] | WO2000DE00213 | Priority number, date | DE1999110971 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19910971 | [2001/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055498 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080308 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080308 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/02, F02M55/02 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
F02M55/025 (EP,US);
F02M63/0225 (EP,US);
F02D2041/3881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/19] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE, MIT EINER HOCHDRUCKPUMPE UND ZWEI DRUCKSPEICHERN | [2001/10] | English: | FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP AND TWO PRESSURE ACCUMULATORS | [2001/10] | French: | SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, COMPRENANT UNE POMPE HAUTE PRESSION ET DEUX ACCUMULATEURS DE PRESSION | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 22.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.01.2005 | IT | 26.01.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 26.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0887544 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 35; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4; | [YA]EP0740067 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * column 5, line 41 - column 10, line 20; figures 1-6 * [A] 1,2; | [A]US5727525 (TSUZUKI YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 27 - column 8, line 22; figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE3044254 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 10, line 1 - page 16, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4407585 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 59 - column 6, line 52; figure . *; | [A]US5564386 (KORTE MAGNUS DIPL ING [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0711914 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,3 * column 1, line 37 - column 4, line 10; figure . * | by applicant | EP0711914 |