Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1165283

EP1165283 - SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR FUNCTIONAL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Profil Verbindungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Otto-Hahn-Strasse 22-24
61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE
[2002/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HUMPERT, Richard
Ahornring 62a
D-61191 Rosbach v.d. Höhe / DE
02 / BABEJ, Jiri
Klosterweg 27
D-35423 Lich / DE
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00907477.414.01.2000
[2002/01]
WO2000EP00271
Priority number, dateDE1999100504108.02.1999         Original published format: DE 19905041
[2002/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0047363
Date:17.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1165283
Date:02.01.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1165283
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23P19/06, B21J15/02, F16B19/05
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/37]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONSTRÄGERANORDNUNG[2002/01]
English:SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR FUNCTIONAL UNIT[2002/01]
French:SYSTEME DE SUPPORT FONCTIONNEL[2002/01]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2001National basic fee paid 
08.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.08.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
06.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2002Fee for grant paid
01.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE11.12.2002
[2003/14]
Cited inInternational search[A]GB545367  (WILLIAM JOHN CHARLES WELLS) [A] 1,2,4,5,13,14,19-24,27,32 * page 2, line 94 - page 3, line 51; figure - *;
 [A]US4212224  (BRAGG ROBERT C JR [US], et al) [A] 1,18,20,21,23,25,26 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0113308  (REXNORD INC [US]) [A] 1,13,14,18,20,21,23,32 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0842733  (PROFIL VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,18,20,21,23,30 * figure -; claims 1,4,17,20 *