Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256115

EP1256115 - PRINTABLE BLANK OF IMPROVED DURABILITY FOR FORMING VIDEO CASSETTE BOXES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fellowes, Inc.
1789 Norwood Avenue
Itasca, Illinois 60143-1095 / US
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / TRACY, Peter
College House 17, King Edward's Road
Ruislip, Middlesex H84 7AE / GB
02 / ATKINSON, Peter
College House 17, King Edward's Road
Ruislip, Middlesex H84 7AE / GB
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2002/46]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date00907511.007.02.2000
[2002/46]
WO2000EP00963
Priority number, dateUS1999040651528.09.1999         Original published format: US 406515
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0124181
Date:05.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256115
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B23/00, G11B23/023, G11B23/40, G11B23/38, G11B33/04
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:DRUCKBARES BLATT VERBESSERTER HALTBARKEIT FÜR DIE KONSTRUKTION VON VIDEOKASSETTENSCHACHTELN[2002/46]
English:PRINTABLE BLANK OF IMPROVED DURABILITY FOR FORMING VIDEO CASSETTE BOXES[2002/46]
French:DECOUPE IMPRIMABLE A DURABILITE AMELIOREE POUR LA FORMATION DE BOITES DE CASSETTES VIDEO[2002/46]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2002National basic fee paid 
25.03.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
19.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
03.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.05.200203   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2002
28.02.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4488644  (WYNALDA ROBERT M [US]) [Y] 1-11,13 * column 3, line 13 - column 3, line 63; figures 1,3,4 * * column 4, line 26 - column 4, line 61 *;
 [Y]US4708285  (SEGALL PETER L [US]) [Y] 1-10,13 * column 2, line 15 - column 2, line 36; figures 1,5-7 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 27 *;
 [Y]US4998985  (SANKEY JAMES K [US]) [Y] 11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5348216  (SCOTT JOHN C [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]US5353931  (ANTIK ALAN L [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *