Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159501

EP1159501 - CYLINDER LOCK WITH ROTATABLE PINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.11.2006  [2006/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dolev, Moshe
17 Bereshit Street
Ramat Hasharon 47201 / IL
[2002/06]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Ziv-Av, Amir
Hanasi Street 3
Kiryat Ono 55570 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / ZIV-AV, Amir
3 Hanasi Street
55570 Kiryat Ono / IL
 [2002/06]
Former [2001/49]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Weydert, Robert , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Weydert, Robert , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date00907919.507.03.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000IL00135
Priority number, dateUS1999026385208.03.1999         Original published format: US 263852
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0053870
Date:14.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159501
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.09.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:E05B19/06, E05B27/10, E05B27/00
[2002/33]
Former International [2001/49]E05B19/06, E05B27/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZYLINDERSCHLOSS MIT ROTIERENDEN STIFTEN[2001/49]
English:CYLINDER LOCK WITH ROTATABLE PINS[2001/49]
French:CYLINDRE A PIVOTS ROTATIFS[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2001National basic fee paid 
13.09.2001Search fee paid 
13.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
03.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/47]
03.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4098104  (WOLTER HEINZ) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO9627724
 [X]FR2492872
 [Y]US4723427
 [Y]US4222252
 [YP]US5931036
 [Y]US5839308