Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083364

EP1083364 - FLYWHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Change - designated statespublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNISIA JECS CORPORATION
1370, Onna Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa-ken 243-8510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
UNISIA JECS CORPORATION
1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIBATA, Daisuke
Unisia Jecs Corporation 1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP
02 / INOUE, Atsushi
Unisia Jecs Corporation 1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Hager, Thomas Johannes , et al
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Hager, Thomas J. , et al
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
D-81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date00907951.809.03.2000
[2001/11]
WO2000JP01408
Priority number, dateJP1999008723629.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8723699
[2001/11]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0058643
Date:05.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1083364
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000
[2001/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/16
[2001/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2001/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SCHWUNGRAD[2001/11]
English:FLYWHEEL[2001/11]
French:VOLANT D'INERTIE[2001/11]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2000Translation filed 
25.10.2000National basic fee paid 
25.10.2000Search fee paid 
25.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/11]
01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
13.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH03219146  (ATSUGI UNISIA CORP);
 [Y]JPH0617880  (UNISIA JECS CORP);
 [Y]JPS55166926U  ;
 [Y]JPS59110455U  ;
 [Y]JPS63167144  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND, et al);
 [Y]JPS6367462  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [A]DE2264974  (KRUPP GMBH)
by applicantJPH03219146