Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164839

EP1164839 - PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR PURIFYING FRESH WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gerritsen, Herman Eric
Zwaluwenburg 53
7423 DW Deventer / NL
For all designated states
Linke, Helmut Wilhelm
Altes Feld 40
58708 Menden / DE
[2002/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Dokter, Hendrik Daniel
Octrooibureau Dokter
P.O. Box 657
7300 AR Apeldoorn / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Dokter, Hendrik Daniel
Octrooibureau Dokter, P.O. Box 657
7300 AR Apeldoorn / NL
Application number, filing date00908115.902.03.2000
[2002/01]
WO2000NL00132
Priority number, dateNL1999101143603.03.1999         Original published format: NL 1011436
[2002/01]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0051422
Date:08.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1164839
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1164839
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01K63/04, C02F3/04
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/01]
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON SÜSSWASSER[2002/01]
English:PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR PURIFYING FRESH WATER[2002/01]
French:PURIFICATEUR POUR EAU DOUCE[2002/01]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2000Translation filed 
07.09.2001National basic fee paid 
07.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
27.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2002Fee for grant paid
03.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
FR27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IT27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
IE03.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2007/10]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
FR27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
IE03.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2006/14]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
FR27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
IE03.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2005/02]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
IE03.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/44]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
IE03.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/39]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
LU02.03.2003
IE03.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/15]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
IE03.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/04]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/43]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE27.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO9607618  (TLOK BERND CH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,10,12 * page 10, line 14 - page 12, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 13,14 [Y] 2;
 [YA]US3669883  (HUCKSTEDT GUIDO, et al) [Y] 2 * column A; figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [A]US5385665  (NEUHAUS ADOLF [DE])