Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163298

EP1163298 - CERAMER COMPOSITION AND COMPOSITE COMPRISING FREE RADICALLY CURABLE FLUOROCHEMICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KANG, Soonkun
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / MOORE, George, G., I.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / RAMBOSEK, Thomas, W.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/51]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00908289.218.01.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US01071
Priority number, dateUS1999025519522.02.1999         Original published format: US 255195
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0050517
Date:31.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163298
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1163298
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09D4/00, C08F222/00
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:CERAMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND KOMPOSIT, DAS EINE RADIKALISCH HÄRTBARE FLUORHALTIGE KOMPONENTE UMFASST[2005/41]
English:CERAMER COMPOSITION AND COMPOSITE COMPRISING FREE RADICALLY CURABLE FLUOROCHEMICAL COMPONENT[2001/51]
French:COMPOSITION DE CERAMERE ET COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSANTE FLUOREE A DURCISSEMENT RADICALAIRE[2005/41]
Former [2001/51]CERAMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FREIE-RADIKALHÄRTBARE, FLUORCHEMISCHE KOMPONENTE ENTHALTENDE VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE
Former [2001/51]COMPOSITION ET COMPOSITE DE CERAMERE CONTENANT UNE COMPOSANTE DE COMPOSE FLUORE A DURCISSEMENT RADICALAIRE
Entry into regional phase19.09.2001National basic fee paid 
19.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
14.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2005Fee for grant paid
11.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
[2007/35]
Former [2006/36]BE19.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO9957205  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [PA] 1-10 * page 3, line 30 - page 6, line 18 * * claim - *;
 [A]WO9700995  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 14 * * page 13, line 34 - page 14, line 23 * * example - * * claim - *;
 [AD]WO9636669  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9739072  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *