Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1153327

EP1153327 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING TORSION IN OPTICAL FIBER RIBBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/46]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CICIRIELLO, Saverio
Via Verdi, 32/D
I-26010 Vaiano Cremasco (CR) / IT
02 / CAROTI, Fabrizio
Via Boccea 287
I-00166 Roma / IT
 [2001/46]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]von Kirschbaum, Alexander , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2001/46]von Kirschbaum, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00908569.709.02.2000
[2001/46]
WO2000US03363
Priority number, dateIT1999MI0024509.02.1999         Original published format: IT MI990245
[2001/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0048031
Date:17.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1153327
Date:14.11.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000
[2001/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1153327
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2001/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2002/37]
Former [2001/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU 
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR BESEITIGUNG DER VERDREHUNG VON OPTISCHEN FASERBÄNDCHEN[2001/46]
English:DEVICE FOR REMOVING TORSION IN OPTICAL FIBER RIBBONS[2001/46]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SUPPRIMER UNE TORSION DANS DES RUBANS DE FIBRES OPTIQUES[2001/46]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2001National basic fee paid 
28.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
04.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2002Fee for grant paid
03.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.09.2002
DE12.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/04]DE12.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/45]DE12.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE4439853  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * column 5, line 19 - line 42; figure 5 *;
 [A]US5659655  (PILATOS JOHN C [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 3; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]JPS6250806  ;
 [A]EP0253728  (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR], et al) [A] 4-7,11 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4438668  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 10,13,14 * column 3, line 19 - line 47; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5802237  (PULIDO JACQUELINE J [US]) [A] 10,11,13-15 * column 1, line 38 - line 67; figures 1-3 *
 [YA]  - KENJI YOSHIOKA ET AL, "THE DEVELOPMENT OF 300-FIBER LIGHT-WEIGHT OPTICAL FIBER CABLE AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES FOR TRUNK NETWORKS", NTT REVIEW,JP,TELECOMMUNICATIONS ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, (19920701), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 58 - 62, XP000310842 [Y] 8,9 * page 59; figures 1,2 * [A] 1
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870806), vol. 011, no. 239, Database accession no. (P - 602), [A] 3,9 * abstract *