Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161647

EP1161647 - METHOD FOR DRYING VENEER AND CORRESPONDING DRYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.04.2005  [2005/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grenzebach BSH GmbH
August-Gottlieb-Strasse 5
36251 Bad Hersfeld / DE
[2003/02]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
BABCOCK-BSH GmbH
August-Gottlieb-Strasse 5
36251 Bad Hersfeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GREBE, Ingo
Bergstrasse 6
D-36286 Neuenstein / DE
02 / WÜNSCHE, Helmut
Hersbach 12
D-36282 Hauneck / DE
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Frese, Beate
Patentanwältin
Hüttenallee 237b
47800 Krefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Frese-Göddeke, Beate, Dr.
Patentanwältin Hüttenallee 237b
47800 Krefeld / DE
Application number, filing date00909220.619.02.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000EP01383
Priority number, dateDE199911083211.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910832
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0053984
Date:14.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161647
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1161647
Date:06.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F26B15/18, F26B25/00
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN VON FURNIEREN UND TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2001/50]
English:METHOD FOR DRYING VENEER AND CORRESPONDING DRYING DEVICE[2001/50]
French:PROCEDE DE SECHAGE DE PLAQUES DE BOIS DE PLACAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE SECHAGE ASSOCIE[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2001National basic fee paid 
11.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
09.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2004Fee for grant paid
19.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]FR2290282  (CREMONA ANGELO [IT]) [DA] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [PA]US5935629  (MARTIN DAVID ALLEN [US]) [PA] 1-4,8 * column W *;
 [A]DE2414654  (MARTIN JEAN MARIE MICHEL) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4654981  (GREBE INGO [DE], et al) [DA] 1,4 * column W *;
 [DA]DE3706353  (KELLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,4 * the whole document *
by applicantDE2523482
 EP0152576
 EP0290056
 DE4109298
 DE4217493
 DE3706353