EP1159237 - METHOD OF PREPARING SURFACE-ACTIVE ALCOHOLS AND SURFACE-ACTIVE ALCOHOLIC ETHERS, PRODUCTS OBTAINED BY SAID METHOD AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAAS, Heiko Anton-Bruckner-Strasse 10 D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 02 /
RÖPER, Michael Pegauer Strasse 10 D-67157 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
WALTER, Marc Hans-Holbein-Strasse 5d D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
SCHULZ, Ralf Maulbronner Hof 35 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 05 /
TROPSCH, Jürgen Im oberen Berg 81 D-67354 Römerberg / DE | 06 /
JÄGER, Hans-Ulrich Erschigweg 31 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00909324.6 | 06.03.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000EP01935 | Priority number, date | DE19991010370 | 09.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19910370 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053547 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159237 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159237 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/10, C07C11/02, C07C29/16, C07C31/125, C07C41/03, C07C43/13, C07F9/11, C07F9/09 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
C07C303/24 (EP,US);
C07C41/03 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07C11/02 (EP,US);
C07C2/10 (EP,US);
C07C29/141 (EP,US);
C07C43/11 (EP,US);
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
C07F9/11 (EP,US);
C09K23/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2521/06 (EP,US);
C07C2521/12 (EP,US);
C07C2523/755 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/141, C07C31/125 (US,EP);
C07C303/24, C07C305/06 (EP,US);
C07C41/03, C07C43/11 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TENSIDALKOHOLEN UND TENSIDALKOHOLETHERN, DIE HERGESTELLTEN PRODUKTE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2001/49] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING SURFACE-ACTIVE ALCOHOLS AND SURFACE-ACTIVE ALCOHOLIC ETHERS, PRODUCTS OBTAINED BY SAID METHOD AND THEIR USE | [2001/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ALCOOLS TENSIOACTIFS ET D'ETHERS D'ALCOOLS TENSIOACTIFS, PRODUITS OBTENUS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2003 | GR | 10.12.2003 | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/14] | GR | 10.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1471481 (UOP INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4339713 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19604466 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,11* the whole document * | Examination | US5780694 |