Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163787

EP1163787 - ECHO SUPPRESSION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vocaltec Communications Ltd.
Maskit Street 2
46733 Herzlia / IL
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
Vocaltec Communications Ltd.
Maskit Street 2
46733 Herzelia / IL
Inventor(s)01 / ERAN, Alon
P.O. Box 0040
70550 Kiryat Ekron / IL
02 / MECAYTEN, Ofir
Zomershtein Street 18
42446 Netanya / IL
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Freed, Arthur Woolf , et al
Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Freed, Arthur Woolf , et al
Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BZ / GB
Application number, filing date00909604.113.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000IL00152
Priority number, dateUS19990124379P15.03.1999         Original published format: US 124379 P
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0056036
Date:21.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1163787
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04M9/08
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON ECHOS[2001/51]
English:ECHO SUPPRESSION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING THE SAME[2001/51]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SUPPRESSION D'ECHO[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2001National basic fee paid 
12.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
01.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0376582  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,5,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0364383  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9840974  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *