Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1173140

EP1173140 - HAIR STYLING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SELECTED POLYALKYLENE GLYCOL STYLING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/04]HAIR STYLING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SELECT POLYALKYLENE GLYCOL STYLING AGENTS
[2005/37]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 01.06.2016  [2016/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2016/22]
Former [2008/28]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2002/04]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOLICH, Raymond, Edward, Jr.
Box 99, 8961 Patton Road
Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US
02 / RIGNEY, Kenneth, Wayne
607 South Broadway
Georgetown, KY 40324 / US
03 / SCOTT, Alic, Anthony
3125 Pine Orchard Lane, Apt 101
Ellicott City MD 21042 / US
04 / KUHLMAN, Dennis, Eugene
6060 Dartford Way
Middletown, OH 45044 / US
05 / SCHNEIDER, Michael, John
6520 Brantford Court
Mason, OH 45040 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2002/15]01 / BOLICH, Raymond, Edward, Jr.
Box 99, 8961 Patton Road
Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US
02 / RIGNEY, Kenneth, Wayne
607 South Broadway
Georgetown, KY 40324 / US
03 / SCOTT, Alic, Anthony
3125 Pine Orchard Lane, Apt #101
Ellicott City MD 21042 / US
04 / KUHLMAN, Dennis, Eugene
6060 Dartford Way
Middletown, OH 45044 / US
05 / SCHNEIDER, Michael, John
6520 Brantford Court
Mason, OH 45040 / US
Former [2002/04]01 / BOLICH, Raymond, Edward, Jr.
Box 99, 8961 Patton Road
Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US
02 / RIGNEY, Kenneth, Wayne
607 South Broadway
Georgetown, KY 40324 / US
03 / SCOTT, Alic, Anthony
500 Williams Street
Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US
04 / KUHLMAN, Dennis, Eugene
6060 Dartford Way
Middletown, OH 45044 / US
05 / SCHNEIDER, Michael, John
6520 Brantford Court
Mason, OH 45040 / US
Representative(s)Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
PO Box 14
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[2016/22]
Former [2014/21]Holmes, Rosalind
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Legal Innovation
Patent Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2014/07]Holmes, Rosalind , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2010/26]Marollé, Patrick Pierre Pascal , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2002/04]Kohol, Sonia , et al
Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date00910197.315.02.2000
[2002/04]
WO2000US03914
Priority number, dateUS1999030550205.05.1999         Original published format: US 305502
US1999046417215.12.1999         Original published format: US 464172
[2002/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0067710
Date:16.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1173140
Date:23.01.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000
[2002/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1173140
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1173140
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)International search reportEP16.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/34, A61K8/89, A61Q5/06
[2008/07]
Former International [2002/04]A61K7/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2016/22]
Former [2002/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:HAARFESTIGUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTEND BESONDERE POLYALKYLEN GLYCOL HAARFORMUNGSMITTEL[2005/37]
English:HAIR STYLING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SELECTED POLYALKYLENE GLYCOL STYLING AGENTS[2005/37]
French:COMPOSITIONS COIFFANTES CONTENANT CERTAINS AGENTS COIFFANTS A BASE DE POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS[2005/37]
Former [2002/04]HAARFESTIGUNGSMITTELN ENTHALTEND BESONDERE POLYALKYLENE GLYCOL HAARFORMUNGS MITTELN
Former [2002/04]HAIR STYLING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SELECT POLYALKYLENE GLYCOL STYLING AGENTS
Former [2002/04]COMPOSITIONS COIFFANTES CONTENANT CERTAINS AGENTS COIFFANTS A BASE DE POLYALKYLENE GLYCOL
Entry into regional phase23.11.2001National basic fee paid 
23.11.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
28.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2008Fee for grant paid
21.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.04.2009   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2009/20]
18.05.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.11.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.12.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
12.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01)
07.07.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.09.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.09.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.09.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.01.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.04.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition24.01.2011Appeal received No.  T0287/11
19.04.2011Statement of grounds filed
01.04.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
01.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.04.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
CY09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
IE15.02.2009
LU15.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/21]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
IE15.02.2009
LU15.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/47]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
IE15.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/09]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
SE09.10.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
IE15.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/07]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
IE15.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/47]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/42]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/39]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
IT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT09.07.2008
FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL09.07.2008
ES20.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0841060  (WELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10,14-16,18-23,29 * page 3, paragraph 1; claims 1,4,7 * * page 3, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 5 *;
 JP2000204025  [ ] (KOSE CORP);
 [A]US5002075  (KELLETT GEORGE W [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-10,14-16,18-23,29 * claims 1-3 *;
 JPH10139632  [ ] (SUNSTAR INC);
 JPH08165225  [ ] (MIRUBON KK, et al);
 JPH0477414  [ ] (LION CORP)
 [PX]  - TOUFUKUJI, RUKA, "Foam-forming aerosol-type hair-styling preparations", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 133:124919 CA, URL: STN, XP002145878 [PX] 1-4,8-10,14-16,18-23,29 * abstract *
 [A]  - OOSAKI, ATSUSHI ET AL, "Hair cosmetic emulsions", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 129:8397 CA, URL: STN, XP002145879 [A] 1-3,8,9,15,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - HATANAKA, KENJI ET AL, "Hair wave-setting preparations containing diglycerin-polyoxypropylene adduct", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 125:176971 CA, URL: STN, XP002145880 [A] 1-3,8,9,15,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - TAJIMA, MASARU ET AL, "Aqueous hair preparations containing polyoxypropylene diglyceryl ether an polyoxypropylene sugar ethers", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 117:97098 CA, URL: STN, XP002145881 [A] 1-3,8,9,15,16 * abstract *
OppositionUS4673569
 US5362312
 US2309722
 US3959463
 GB747806