Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1173140 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1074
06.05.2016 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.04.2016 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
19.04.2016 French translation of claims Opposition 2
19.04.2016 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
20.01.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
20.01.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
20.01.2016 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
11.01.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.09.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.09.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
17.09.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
17.09.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 18
17.09.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
17.09.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 18
17.09.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 102
03.09.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Claims Opposition 6
31.07.2015 Claims Opposition 4
31.07.2015 Claims Opposition 4
31.07.2015 Claims Opposition 6
31.07.2015 Claims Opposition 5
31.07.2015 Claims Opposition 5
31.07.2015 Claims Opposition 5
31.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
13.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
12.06.2015 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 6
12.06.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.06.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.05.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.05.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
05.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.05.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
29.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.04.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.04.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.04.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.03.2015 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.2015 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.03.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
06.10.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 22
27.08.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
14.04.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
14.04.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 10
01.04.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
31.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.03.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
07.03.2014 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
24.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.01.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
10.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.01.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.12.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
06.12.2013 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
03.12.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
31.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.07.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
13.06.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.03.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
17.02.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
11.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 5
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 6
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 5
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 5
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 6
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 5
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 5
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 5
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Claims Appeal 4
05.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.01.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
06.05.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.04.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
11.02.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
27.01.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
15.12.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
15.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
15.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 21
15.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 7
14.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 4
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 4
06.10.2010 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
08.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2010 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
27.05.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.04.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.04.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
14.04.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.04.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.04.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2009 Claims Opposition 4
30.11.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
24.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.04.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
08.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
08.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.04.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
12.06.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.05.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.05.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
21.05.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
24.01.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.01.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.01.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.01.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
20.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
20.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.02.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.01.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.09.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.09.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
25.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
25.11.2004 Description Search / examination 15
25.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.11.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.11.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.01.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
26.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.11.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.11.2003 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.07.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.07.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2002 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.01.2002 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.2001 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.12.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.12.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.12.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.11.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
23.11.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
26.06.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
18.04.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
18.04.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
18.04.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.04.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.04.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.03.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.03.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.12.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.12.2000 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.12.2000 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.11.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.11.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.11.2000 Priority document Search / examination 32
29.11.2000 Priority document Search / examination 34
23.11.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.11.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
16.11.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 31
13.11.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
27.03.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
27.03.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 5
27.03.2000 Description International Searching Authority 24
27.03.2000 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1