Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236133

EP1236133 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING BUSINESS TO ONE OF A PLURALITY OF SELLERS IN A BUYER DRIVEN ELECTRONIC COMMERCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.03.2006  [2006/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Priceline.Com Incorporated
800 Connecticut Avenue
Norwalk, CT 06854 / US
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / WALKER, Jay S.
124 Spectacle Lane
Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US
02 / SPARICO, Thomas M.
525 East 72nd Street, Apartment 23F
New York, NY 10021 / US
03 / WISSE, Robert, S.
12 Pinehurst Lane
Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Maggs, Michael Norman
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Maggs, Michael Norman
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date00910216.117.02.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US04064
Priority number, dateUS1999025257418.02.1999         Original published format: US 252574
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0049546
Date:24.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1236133
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.04.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesAL10.07.2001
LT10.07.2001
LV10.07.2001
MK10.07.2001
RO10.07.2001
SI10.07.2001
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUTEILUNG VON GESCHÄFT ZUM EINEM VON MEHREREN VERKÄUFER IN EINEM KAUFER KONTROLLIERTES ELEKTRONISHES HANDELSYSTEM.[2002/36]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING BUSINESS TO ONE OF A PLURALITY OF SELLERS IN A BUYER DRIVEN ELECTRONIC COMMERCE SYSTEM[2002/36]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR ATTRIBUER UNE ENTREPRISE EN LIGNE A UN OU A PLUSIEURS VENDEURS DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMERCE ELECTRONIQUE DIRIGE PAR LES ACHETEURS[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2001National basic fee paid 
10.07.2001Search fee paid 
10.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.07.2001Examination requested  [2002/36]
01.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/12]
24.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200405   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2004
28.02.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
International search[A]US5794207  (WALKER JAY S [US], et al);
 [A]WO9810361  (WALKER ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD [US]);
 [Y]EP0512702  (REUTERS LTD [GB]);
 [Y]US5822737  (OGRAM MARK E [US]);
 [Y]US5640390  (SAKAMOTO ATSUSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5101353  (LUPIEN WILLIAM A [US], et al);
 [A]US5758328  (GIOVANNOLI JOSEPH [US]);
 [X]  - HENSLEY H.G., "I will take Juarez", DATABASE GALE GROUP TRADE (148), Database accession no. 04121341, XP002950624
    [] - TRAVEL WEEKLY, vol. 45, pages 7 - 10,
 [AP]  - ANONYMOUS, "Another reason to love those affluent customers", DATABASE BUSINESS & INDUSTRY, Database accession no. 02525239, XP002935378
    [] - JEWELERS' CIRCULAR-KEYSTONE, (199907), vol. CLXX, no. 7, page 64,
 [Y]  - GIBSON R. ET AL., "Marketing: Fast-food chains hope diner swallow new 'Value' menu of higher-priced items", THE WALL STREET JOURNAL, (19920313), page B1, XP002935377