Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159855

EP1159855 - DISPOSABLE HEARING AID WITH INTEGRAL POWER SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ACETI, John, Gregory
7 Monroe Drive
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
02 / SJURSEN, Walter, Paul
6 Bankers Drive
Washington Crossing, PA 18977 / US
03 / LEEDOM, Marvin, Allan
26 Cleveland Lane, RD No.4
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
04 / MAHONEY, Derek
1 Quail Court
Manalapan, NJ 07726 / US
05 / FRITZ, Frederick, J.
15 Augusta Court
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date00910366.428.02.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000US04963
Priority number, dateUS1999026359305.03.1999         Original published format: US 263593
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0052964
Date:08.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1159855
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
TitleGerman:WEGWERFBARES HÖRHILFEGERÄT MIT INTEGRIERTEN STROMQUELLEN[2001/49]
English:DISPOSABLE HEARING AID WITH INTEGRAL POWER SOURCE[2001/49]
French:PROTH SE AUDITIVE JETABLE AVEC SOURCE D'ALIMENTATION INT GR E[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2001National basic fee paid 
02.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/29]
07.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
22.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9736456  (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]WO9734443  (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 1; figure - *