Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1158951

EP1158951 - COSMETIC AGENT FOR REMOVAL OF A FILM FORMED BY CROSS-LINKED HYBRID MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.10.2003  [2003/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / QUINN, Francis
25, rue Gay Lussac
F-75005 Paris / FR
02 / GIUSTINIANI, Pascal
21, rue Volta Prolongée
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
03 / SANCHEZ, Clément
9, Résidence du Château de Courcelles
F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Tanty, François , et al
Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Tanty, François , et al
Nony & Associés, 3, Rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2001/49]Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard
NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00910914.109.03.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000FR00584
Priority number, dateFR1999000294710.03.1999         Original published format: FR 9902947
[2001/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0053153
Date:14.09.2000
Language:FR
[2000/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1158951
Date:05.12.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/02
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHES MITTEL ZUM ABSCHMINKEN EINER FILMBILDENDEN BESCHICHTUNG AUS EINEM VERNETZTEN HYBRIDMATERIAL[2001/49]
English:COSMETIC AGENT FOR REMOVAL OF A FILM FORMED BY CROSS-LINKED HYBRID MATERIAL[2001/49]
French:AGENT COSMETIQUE POUR LE DEMAQUILLAGE D'UN REVETEMENT FILMOGENE EN MATERIAU HYBRIDE RETICULE[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2001National basic fee paid 
10.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
03.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/42]
16.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]FR414816  (CHARLES PHILIP LOWNDES TITHERL [GB]) [A] 1,3,8,11 * claim 1 * * page 1, lines 25-37 *;
 [A]FR1464035  (P.V.DURAFFOURD) [A] 1,3,8,10,11 * claims 1,2 * * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]FR2019719  (GILLETTE CO) [A] 1 * claims 1,8 *