Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080590

EP1080590 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROAMING FOR PREPAID MOBILE TELEPHONE SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.03.2007  [2007/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Star Home GmbH
c/o Bellerive Treuhand AG, Bellerivestrasse 201
8008 Zurich / CH
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / SOFER, Carmel
Hermon Street 28
90805 Mevaseret Zion / IL
02 / WOLFMAN, Shlomo
Shabtai Street 13
45257 Hod Hasharon / IL
03 / BIRAN, Ory
Mordechai Street 86
36023 Kiriyat Tiveon / IL
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[2006/04]
Former [2003/39]Waxweiler, Jean
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2001/10]Kinsler, Maureen Catherine , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date00911225.116.03.2000
[2001/10]
WO2000IL00171
Priority number, dateUS19990124846P17.03.1999         Original published format: US 124846 P
US20000176805P19.01.2000         Original published format: US 176805 P
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0056085
Date:21.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080590
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/10]
Search report(s)International search reportUS21.09.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04M17/00, H04Q7/38
[2006/23]
Former International [2001/10]H04Q7/20, H04M11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM UMHORSTREIFEN FÜR VORAUSBEZAHLTEN MOBILTELEFONDIENSTEN[2001/10]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROAMING FOR PREPAID MOBILE TELEPHONE SERVICE[2001/10]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ITINERANCE POUR UN SERVICE DE TELEPHONIE MOBILE PREPAYE[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2000National basic fee paid 
14.12.2000Search fee paid 
14.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
28.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/11]
26.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200203   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2002
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9834393  (NAT TELEMANAGEMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,9 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 4 * * page 10, line 11 - page 15, line 3 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 8,10;
 [X]WO9849860  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 6,9 * page 7, line 12 - page 15, line 5 * * figures 2-5 *;
 [Y]WO9825237  (AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATE [US]) [Y] 8,10 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 2 * * page 15, line 10 - page 16, line 17 * * figure 7 *;
 [A]WO9736447  (MARKPORT LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9 * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 24 * * page 9, line 20 - page 13, line 2 * * figures 2-4,6-9 *;
 [DPA]WO9957914  (COMVERSE TECH INC [US], et al) [DPA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9918713  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [PA] 8,10 * pages 3,9-16; figures 1,4,5 *
 [X]  BECHER R ET AL PINNACLE GROUP, "CAMEL: THE IMPACT OF PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS ON INTELLIGENT NETWORKS", ISS '97. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM). GLOBAL NETWORK EVOLUTION: CONVERGENCE OR COLLISION? TORONTO, SEPT. 21 - 26, 1997, ISS. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM), TORONTO, P, (19970921), VOL. 2, pages 225 - 233, XP000704472 [X] 1,5,7,9 * page 227, column L - page 232, column R *
 [X]  HARAN D, "DEPLOYING IN SERVICES IN A MOBILE ENVIRONMENT", ANNUAL REVIEW OF COMMUNICATIONS, NATIONAL ENGINEERING CONSORTIUM, CHICAGO, IL, US, (1997), vol. 50, ISSN 0886-229X, pages 1043 - 1049, XP000720970 [X] 1,5,7,9 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5854975  (FOUGNIES DOUGLAS V [US], et al);
 [Y]US5796790  (BRUNNER ROBERT FRANK [CA]);
 [YP]US6029062  (HANSON DANIEL A [US]);
 [YP]US5898922  (REININGHAUS GEORG [DE]);
 [AP]US5920821  (SEAZHOLTZ JOHN W [US], et al);
 [AE]US6075982  (DONOVAN STEVEN [US], et al);
 [A]US5845211  (ROACH JR PETER O [US])