Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243616

EP1243616 - THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2014
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.12.2014  [2015/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
3-23, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8205 / JP
[2014/03]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Katsumi
37-7, Kamikodanaka 1-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0053 / JP
02 / Hoshina, Toshikazu
504, 2156, Kamikuratacho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0816 / JP
 [2013/35]
Former [2002/39]01 / SUZUKI, Katsumi
37-7, Kamikodanaka 1-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0053 / JP
02 / HOSHINA, Toshikazu
504, 2156, Kamikuratacho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0816 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2014/04]
Former [2007/36]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/39]Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr. , et al
Patentanwalt, Metzlerstrasse 27
60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date00911278.022.03.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000JP01742
Priority number, dateJP1999036241321.12.1999         Original published format: JP 36241399
[2002/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0146316
Date:28.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243616
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1243616
Date:22.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/10, C08L53/02, C08L25/06
[2004/11]
Former International [2002/39]C08L25/04, C08L23/10, C08L53/02
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2002/39]
English:THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION[2002/39]
French:COMPOSITION DE RESINE THERMOPLASTIQUE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2001Translation filed 
11.08.2001National basic fee paid 
11.08.2001Search fee paid 
11.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2001Examination requested  [2009/46]
07.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: EURO-PCT translation(s) not filed
13.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2013Fee for grant paid
11.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.10.2009
Opposition(s)23.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
19.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1029876  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [E] 1-8 * claim 9; table 2 *;
 [XD]JPH06184366  ;
 [X]JPH06345914
 [XD]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 31, Database accession no. 1994-252949, XP002267536 & JPH06184366 A 19940705 (KURARAY CO LTD) [XD] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 10, Database accession no. 1995-070424, XP002267537 & JPH06345914 A 19941220 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK) [X] 1-8 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH0445140  (TONEN CORP);
 [X]JPH06192502  (DAICEL CHEM);
 [Y]GB2003891  (GEN ELECTRIC);
 [A]EP0004685  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 [A]WO9313168  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US])
by applicantEP1029876
 JPH0445140
 JPH06192502
 JP3619286B