Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080690

EP1080690 - X-RAY CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2011
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.11.2011  [2011/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Toshiyoshi
5-9, Tsutsujigaokaminami 4-chome
Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1347 / JP
02 / SHIMADA, Takuo
6-32-601, Sumiyoshiyamate 4-chome, Higashinada-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0063 / JP
03 / SAKATA, Atsushi
10-3-3, Yamatecho 1-chome
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1103 / JP
04 / KONDO, Kazuya
6-22-308, Shinkitano 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0025 / JP
05 / INO, Yoshihiro
1-100-201, Seiwadaihigashi 2-chome
Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0142 / JP
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/23]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2001/10]Schuster, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys.
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00911315.023.03.2000
[2001/10]
WO2000JP01784
Priority number, dateJP1999008584429.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8584499
[2001/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0057786
Date:05.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080690
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080690
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/49]
Search report(s)International search reportJP05.10.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:RÖNTGENKAMERA[2001/10]
English:X-RAY CAMERA[2001/10]
French:CAMERA A RAYONS X[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2000Translation filed 
29.11.2000National basic fee paid 
29.11.2000Search fee paid 
29.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
24.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2010Fee for grant paid
22.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US5778044  (BRUIJNS ANTONIUS J C [NL]) [X] 1-8,11,14 * column 1, lines 46-58 * * column 9, lines 23-25 * * column 10, lines 1-5 *
International search[X]JPH0542130  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH08215190  (MORITA MFG, et al);
 [A]JPH10213667  (SHIMADZU CORP)
by applicantUS5778044
 JPH0542130