Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159202

EP1159202 - POURING DEVICE FOR A CANISTER-TYPE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
"Pack-Pro" Kunststoff- und Metallverpackungs GmbH
Oberschauersberg 116
4641 Steinhaus / AT
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / WEIKINGER, Peter
Stadtplatz 44
A-4600 Wels / AT
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Hübscher, Helmut , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher
Postfach 411
4010 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Spittelwiese 7
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date00912243.309.03.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000AT00059
Priority number, dateAT1999000045415.03.1999         Original published format: AT 45499
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0055059
Date:21.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159202
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1159202
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65D25/40, B65D47/06
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/50]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:AUSGIESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN KANISTERARTIGEN BEHÄLTER[2001/49]
English:POURING DEVICE FOR A CANISTER-TYPE CONTAINER[2001/49]
French:DISPOSITIF VERSEUR POUR UN CONTENANT DE TYPE BIDON[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2001National basic fee paid 
25.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
25.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2002Fee for grant paid
12.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2113000  (R V HUENERSDORFF NACHF FRIEDRI) [A] 1-3 * page 2, paragraph 3; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]GB204893  (BERT GUY) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 111 - line 112; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2134285  (MANUPLAST) [A] 1 * page 1, line 4 - line 6; figure 1 *;
 [A]US1676711  (REAP EDWARD A) [A] 1 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US4781313  (VERHEYEN WILLY [BE]) [A] 4 * column 2, line 60 - line 61; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE2153155  (SCHIEMANN DR WOLFRAM) [A] 5 * page 5, paragraph 1; figure 3 *
by applicantDE29720426U
 DE19615906