Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265690

EP1265690 - TUBING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W. L. Gore & Associates GmbH
Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/11]For all designated states
W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH
Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES GmbH
Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KILLER, Anton
Steinsbergerweg
D-83623 Dietramszell / DE
02 / BIER, Christian
Steinsbergerweg 1
D-83623 Dietramszell / DE
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Weber, Doris
W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH
Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/12]Weber, Doris
W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
Application number, filing date00912638.423.03.2000
[2002/51]
WO2000EP02588
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0170375
Date:27.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1265690
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1265690
Date:12.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/22, B01D69/08
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/51]
TitleGerman:SCHLAUCHEINHEIT[2002/51]
English:TUBING UNIT[2002/51]
French:ENSEMBLE DE TUYAUX[2002/51]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2002National basic fee paid 
27.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
19.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2008Fee for grant paid
25.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
LU23.03.2008
BE31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
GR13.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT18.08.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/32]CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
LU23.03.2008
BE31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT18.08.2008
Former [2009/42]CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
BE31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT18.08.2008
Former [2009/14]DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
BE31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT18.08.2008
Former [2009/08]DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT18.08.2008
Former [2008/49]FI12.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT18.08.2008
Former [2008/46]FI12.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI12.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5698161  (MONTOYA JEAN P [US]) [X] 1-4,12-29 * column 3, line 39 - line 58; figure - * * column 5, line 13 - column 8, line 2 * [A] 5-11;
 [DA]EP0677321  (GORE & ASS [DE]) [DA] 30-36 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19639964  (GORE W L & ASS GMBH [DE])
Examination   - MACKLEY M.R.; NI X., "Experimental fluid dispersion measurements in periodic baffled tube arrays", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, UK, (19930108), vol. 48, no. 18, pages 3293 - 3305
    - MACKLEY M.R.; NI X., "Mixing and dispersion in a baffled tube for steady laminar and pulsatile flow", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, UK, (19910307), vol. 46, no. 12, pages 3139 - 3151