Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1185448

EP1185448 - BACK-UP BRAKING IN ELECTRO-HYDRAULIC (EHB) BRAKING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
[2002/11]
Inventor(s)01 / HARRIS, Alan Leslie
24 Malvern Road, Balsall Common
Coventry CV7 7DU / GB
 [2002/11]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [2002/11]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date00912792.924.03.2000
[2002/11]
WO2000GB01122
Priority number, dateGB1999001019305.05.1999         Original published format: GB 9910193
[2002/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0068056
Date:16.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1185448
Date:13.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000
[2002/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1185448
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60T17/18, B60T7/08
[2002/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/24]
Former [2002/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSHILFS-/BACK-UP-BREMSSYSTEM IN EINEM ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHEN BREMSSYSTEM[2002/11]
English:BACK-UP BRAKING IN ELECTRO-HYDRAULIC (EHB) BRAKING SYSTEMS[2002/11]
French:FREINAGE DE SECOURS DANS UN SYSTEME DE FREINAGE ELECTROHYDRAULIQUE (EHB)[2002/11]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2001National basic fee paid 
23.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/11]
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2003Fee for grant paid
08.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US5139315  (WALENTY ALLEN J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 63 * * column 7, line 47 - line 61 * * abstract *;
 [A]WO9741016  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 12 - line 33 * * page 6, line 20 - line 35; figure . *;
 [A]EP0825081  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 46 - line 58; claim 11 *;
 [A]JPH05199605  ;
 [A]US5310251  (TOWERS KENNETH S [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931125), vol. 017, no. 635, Database accession no. (M - 1514), [A] 1 * abstract *