Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097040

EP1097040 - HIGH SURFACE GLOSS, CO-EXTRUDED SHEETS FROM OLEFIN POLYMER MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A.
Via Pergolesi 25
20125 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A.
Via Pergolesi, 25
20124 Milano / IT
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
Basell Technology Company B.V.
Hoeksteen 66
2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Montell Technology Company bv
Hoeksteen 66
2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SHAH, Bakhtiar, Alam
36 Long Drive
Elkton, MD 21921 / US
02 / ROSENTHAL, Jay, S.
193 South Benjamin Drive
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Colucci, Giuseppe , et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Piazzale G. Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]Colucci, Giuseppe , et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A., Intellectual Property, P.le G. Donegani 12
44100 Ferrara / IT
Former [2001/19]Gaverini, Gaetano , et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property Via Pergolesi 25
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00912854.706.04.2000
[2001/19]
WO2000IB00423
Priority number, dateUS1999031509819.05.1999         Original published format: US 315098
US1999045486903.12.1999         Original published format: US 454869
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0071338
Date:30.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1097040
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000
[2001/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32, C08J5/18, C08L23/10, C08K5/1575
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:COEXTRUDIERTE FOLIEN AUS OLEFINISCHEN POLYMERMATERIALIEN MIT HOHEM OBERFLÄCHENGLANZ[2001/19]
English:HIGH SURFACE GLOSS, CO-EXTRUDED SHEETS FROM OLEFIN POLYMER MATERIALS[2001/19]
French:FEUILLES CO-EXTRUDEES, A FORT BRILLANT DE SURFACE, PRODUITES A PARTIR DE MATERIAUX POLYMERES OLEFINIQUES[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2001National basic fee paid 
06.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/28]
06.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/49]
21.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0873862  (MONTELL NORTH AMERICA INC [US]) [DX] 1-3,7,9,10,12-16 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 14 * * page 8, line 16 - line 41 * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 38 * * example 4; tables 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0863183  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11,14-20 * page 5, line 2 - line 6 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 56 * * page 9, line 50 - page 10, line 13 * * page 13, line 46 - page 14, line 15 * * page 23, line 1 - line 40; table 3 * * claims 11-24 *;
 [A]US5011737  (SMITH RAYNA W [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8,14,18,21 * column 6, line 55 - line 63 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0801102  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 36 - line 39 * * page 5, line 58 - page 6, line 6 *;
 [A]EP0716121  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-6,14-19 * page 5, line 7 - line 47 * * page 19, line 10 - page 22, line 31 * * page 23, line 19 - page 24, line 11 * * page 39; examples 10-12; tables 4-II * * page 42; examples 15-17; tables 5-II *