Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066538

EP1066538 - MEASUREMENT OF PROCESS PRODUCT DIELECTRIC CONSTANT USING A LOW POWER RADAR LEVEL TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROSEMOUNT INC.
12001 Technology Drive
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2001/02]
Inventor(s)01 / DIEDE, Kurt, C.
15728 Hayes Trail
Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00913232.518.01.2000
[2001/02]
WO2000US01087
Priority number, dateUS1999023511421.01.1999         Original published format: US 235114
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0043806
Date:27.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1066538
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1066538
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/88, G01N22/00
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2001/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:MESSUNG DER DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTE EINES PROZESSPRODUKTES MITTELS EINES NIEDERLEISTUNGSRADARNIVEAUGEBERS[2005/49]
English:MEASUREMENT OF PROCESS PRODUCT DIELECTRIC CONSTANT USING A LOW POWER RADAR LEVEL TRANSMITTER[2001/02]
French:MESURE DE CONSTANTE DIELECTRIQUE DE PRODUITS D'UN PROCESSUS, EN UTILISANT UNE BASE EMETTRICE DE TYPE RADAR BASSE PUISSANCE[2001/02]
Former [2001/02]MESSUNG DER DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTE EINES PROZESSPRODUKES MITTELS EINES NIEDERLEISTUNGSRADARNIVEAUGEBERS
Entry into regional phase23.08.2000National basic fee paid 
23.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
20.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2006Fee for grant paid
06.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200203   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2002
31.01.200304   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB18.01.2007
FR31.01.2007
[2008/24]
Former [2007/51]GB18.01.2007
Cited inInternational search[YA]US3995212  (ROSS GERALD F) [Y] 1,2,11,12,14-16 * abstract * [A] 3-10,13,17-23;
 [Y]US5656774  (NELSON STEVEN D [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,11,12,14-16 * figures 2,4 * * column 3, line 67 - line 68 * * column 4, line 1 - line 34 *;
 [A]US5726578  (HOOK WILLIAM R [CA]) [A] 1-23 * abstract *;
 [A]US5157337  (NEEL MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 23 * column 4, line 5 - line 14 *