Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163282

EP1163282 - PROCESSES FOR MAKING POLYMERS CONTAINING PENDANT CYCLIC ANHYDRIDE GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD.
5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/21]For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD.
5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, North Carolina 28217 / US
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
The B.F. Goodrich Company
3 Coliseum Centre, 2550 W. Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4543 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JAYARAMAN, Saikumar
12185 Waywood Drive
Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US
02 / GOODALL, Brian, L.
19312 Creek Round Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US
03 / VICARI, Richard
9937 Huntington Park Drive
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
04 / LIPIAN, John-Henry
Apartment 206, 12631 Walnut Hills Drive
North Royalton, OH 44133 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00913880.109.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US06318
Priority number, dateUS19990124052P12.03.1999         Original published format: US 124052 P
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0053657
Date:14.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163282
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1163282
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G61/08
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMEREN ENTHALTEND CYCLISCHE ANHYDRIDE ALS SEITENGRUPPEN[2001/51]
English:PROCESSES FOR MAKING POLYMERS CONTAINING PENDANT CYCLIC ANHYDRIDE GROUPS[2001/51]
French:PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMERES CONTENANT DES GROUPES ANHYDRIDES CYCLIQUES PENDANTS[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2001National basic fee paid 
11.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
28.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2003Fee for grant paid
26.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.05.2003
BE28.05.2003
CH28.05.2003
CY28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
IT28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
NL28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2007/08]AT28.05.2003
BE28.05.2003
CH28.05.2003
CY28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
NL28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/28]AT28.05.2003
BE28.05.2003
CH28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
NL28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/23]AT28.05.2003
CH28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
NL28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT28.05.2003
CH28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
NL28.05.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT28.05.2003
CH28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
NL28.05.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
ES08.09.2003
Former [2004/02]CH28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
NL28.05.2003
GR28.08.2003
PT28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
Former [2004/01]CH28.05.2003
LI28.05.2003
SE28.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE28.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9637528  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [Y] 1 * claims 1,4 *;
 [A]JPH10298270  ;
 [Y]WO9637526  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [Y] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO9733198  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [Y] 1 * page 34; claim 2 *
 [Y]  - WATKINS N ET AL, "RING OPENING METATHESIS POLYMERIZATION OF CYCLIC ALKENES CONTAININGHETEROATOMS", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,DE,WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, (19940401), vol. 195, no. 4, ISSN 1022-1352, pages 1147 - 1164, XP000439864 [Y] 1 * page 1157 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1994.021950404
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, [A] 1 * abstract *