Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257324

EP1257324 - IMPROVED LASER COMB DESIGN/FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.10.2012  [2012/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lexington LaserComb IP AG
Markplatz 4
9004 St. Gallen / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/09]For all designated states
Lexington LaserComb IP AG
Markplatz 4
9000 St. Gallen / CH
Former [2010/02]For all designated states
Lexington LaserComb IP AG
Hinterlauben 12
9000 St. Gallen / CH
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
Lexington LaserComb IP AG
Hinterlauben 12
9000 St Gallen / CH
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Pearl, Henry
Unit 3, 55 Shirley Road
Wollstonecraft, NSW 2065 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Pearl, Henry
Unit 2, 473 Willoughby Road
Willoughby, NSW 2066 / AU
 [2004/52]
Former [2002/47]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Findlay, Alice Rosemary , et al
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]Findlay, Alice Rosemary , et al
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
Former [2004/52]Findlay, Alice Rosemary , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [2002/47]Findlay, Alice Rosemary
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date00913974.211.04.2000
[2002/47]
WO2000AU00302
Priority number, dateAU2000001754817.02.2000         Original published format: AU 1754800
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0160457
Date:23.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257324
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257324
Date:13.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU23.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/067, A61N5/06
[2003/31]
Former International [2002/47]A61N5/067
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE DESIGN/FUNKTION EINES LASERKAMMES[2002/47]
English:IMPROVED LASER COMB DESIGN/FUNCTION[2002/47]
French:CONCEPTION/FONCTION AMELIOREES D'UN PEIGNE A LASER[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase10.09.2002National basic fee paid 
10.09.2002Search fee paid 
10.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
10.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
18.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2006Date of oral proceedings
21.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.09.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2009Fee for grant paid
30.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination28.11.2006Appeal received No.  T0533/07
30.01.2007Statement of grounds filed
05.12.2008Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
05.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
Opposition(s)14.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
LU11.04.2010
GR14.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
[2012/43]
Former [2011/07]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/50]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/49]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/47]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/38]AT13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/35]AT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/30]AT13.01.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9102407U  (MINK M) [X] 1-5 * page 3 * * figure - *;
 [X]US5300097  (LERNER ETHAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 10 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]EP0593375  (LASER MED TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 33 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5303722  (GODFREY ROBIN E [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 32 - line 50 * * column 8, line 15 - line 65 * * figure - *
International search[X]DE3336939  (SAALMANN GERHARD);
 [Y]DE3511281  (SAALMANN GERHARD);
 [A]FR2518412  (LAGUERRE RENE [FR])