Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1151286

EP1151286 - A MICRO-ELECTRONIC BOND DEGRADATION SENSOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Defence Science and Technology Organisation of the Department of Defence
Canberra, ACT / AU
[2002/34]
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
Analatom Incorporated
Suite 9, 540 Weddell Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WILSON, Alan
26 Nerissa Street
Burwood, VIC 3125 / AU
 [2001/45]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/45]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00914558.208.02.2000
[2001/45]
WO2000US03308
Priority number, dateUS19990119166P08.02.1999         Original published format: US 119166 P
[2001/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0046593
Date:10.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1151286
Date:07.11.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000
[2001/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1151286
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/24
[2001/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/52]
Former [2001/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL20.07.2001
LT20.07.2001
LV20.07.2001
MK20.07.2001
RO20.07.2001
SI20.07.2001
TitleGerman:MIKROELEKTRONISCHER SENSOR ZUR FESTSTELLUNG EINER BINDUNGSVERSCHLECHTERUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2001/45]
English:A MICRO-ELECTRONIC BOND DEGRADATION SENSOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2001/45]
French:CAPTEUR DE DEGRADATION DE COLLAGES EN MICRO-ELECTRONIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2001/45]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2001National basic fee paid 
20.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.07.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/45]
14.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2004Fee for grant paid
14.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
IT22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
CY08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
PT22.05.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
IT22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
CY08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2007/20]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
CY08.02.2005
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2007/08]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE08.02.2005
LU08.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2006/32]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
FR22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE08.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2006/23]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
IE08.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2006/14]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
MC28.02.2005
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2006/13]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
DE23.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
ES02.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI22.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]US5245293  (RUNNER JACK A [US]) [A] 1,8,15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4239495  (LUBER WILLIBALD [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19707788  (I M E S GES FUER INNOVATIVE ME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE8706256U  (BAYER AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2423776  (EXPER RECH ETU BATIMENT CENTRE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5833820  (DUBIN VALERY [US]) [A] 19,21,23-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4906346  (HADERSBECK HANS [DE], et al) [A] 19,21,23-25 * the whole document *