Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163704

EP1163704 - METAL SPONGES FOR RAPID SURFACE-CHEMICAL REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY
10900 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44106-4984 / US
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / WELSCH, Gerhard
2514 Edgehill Road
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
02 / McGERVEY, Donald
1819 Wilton Road
Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 / US
03 / SZOZDOWSKI, Paul
21600 Miller Avenue
Euclid, OH 44119 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00914963.415.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US06724
Priority number, dateUS19990124443P15.03.1999         Original published format: US 124443 P
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0055931
Date:21.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163704
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/64, H01M4/70, H01M4/30, C01B6/02, C25C5/02
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:METALLSCHWÄMME FÜR SCHNELLE CHEMISCHE OBERFLÄCHENREAKTIONEN[2001/51]
English:METAL SPONGES FOR RAPID SURFACE-CHEMICAL REACTIONS[2001/51]
French:EPONGES METALLIQUES POUR REACTIONS CHIMIQUES RAPIDES EN SURFACE[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2001National basic fee paid 
13.09.2001Search fee paid 
13.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
01.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/28]
15.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200405   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4347429  (WILL FRITZ G);
 [X]US5800639  (YAN DE YI [US]);
 [X]US5780186  (CASEY JR JOHN E [US]);
 [X]US5496462  (ALBERT LUC [FR]);
 [X]JPS5036936