EP1088993 - SUCTION MUFFLER AND CLOSED ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2009/10] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Matsushita Refrigeration Company 2-5 Takaida Hondoori 4-chome Higashi, Osaka-shi, Osaka 577-0066 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IDE, Terumasa 6-4-3, Tsujido-motomachi Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0861 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/14] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Clemensstrasse 30 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915471.7 | 10.04.2000 | [2001/14] | WO2000JP02335 | Priority number, date | JP19990107932 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10793299 | [2001/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0063558 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088993 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
F04B39/0072 (EP,US);
F04B39/00 (KR);
B29C65/362 (EP,US);
B29C65/3644 (EP,US);
B29C66/124 (EP,US);
B29C66/1312 (EP,US);
B29C66/24243 (EP,US);
B29C66/24244 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/8161 (EP,US);
B29C66/83221 (EP,US);
B29C65/0618 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/3668 (EP,US);
B29C65/3676 (EP,US);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/322 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2067/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUSGANGSSCHALLDÄMPFER UND GESCHLOSSENER ELEKTRISCHER KOMPRESSOR | [2001/14] | English: | SUCTION MUFFLER AND CLOSED ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR | [2001/14] | French: | SILENCIEUX D'ASPIRATION ET COMPRESSEUR ELECTRIQUE FERME | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2000 | Translation filed | 01.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 20.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2013 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2014 | 15   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2015 | 16   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2016 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4401418 (FRITCHMAN JACK F [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4759693 (OUTZEN SVEND E [DK]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US4801343 (TAMBA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4978825 (SCHMIDT WAYNE W [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0902184 (CLAM S P A [IT]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5943917 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [A]JPH09242670 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH10252653 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) |