Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1188792

EP1188792 - FLAME-RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Dow Limited
15-3, Nihonbashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/12]For all designated states
Sumitomo Dow Limited
15-3, Nihonbashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UMEYAMA, Satoshi
Sumitomo Dow Limited, 10-1, Tsukahara 2-chome
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1046 / JP
02 / SHINOMIYA, Tadashi
Sumitomo Dow Limited, 10-1, Tsukahara 2-chome
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1046 / JP
03 / SATO, Ichiro
Sumitomo Dow Limited, 10-1, Tsukahara 2-chome
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1046 / JP
04 / IJI, Masatoshi
Nec Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
05 / SERIZAWA, Shin
Nec Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2002/12]
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Blackfriars House The Parsonage
5th Floor
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/31]Wilson Gunn Gee
Chancery House, Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Former [2002/12]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date00915548.214.04.2000
[2002/12]
WO2000JP02472
Priority number, dateJP1999011656023.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11656099
[2002/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0064976
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1188792
Date:20.03.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000
[2002/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1188792
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.11.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08L69/00, C08K5/42, // (C08L69/00, 27:12), C08L83:04
[2002/12]
Designated contracting statesDE [2004/21]
Former [2002/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:FLAMMHEMMENDE POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2002/12]
English:FLAME-RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION[2002/12]
French:COMPOSITION IGNIFUGE DE RESINE DE POLYCARBONATE[2002/12]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2001Translation filed 
17.10.2001National basic fee paid 
17.10.2001Search fee paid 
17.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
17.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/12]
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2005Fee for grant paid
02.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3971756  (BIALOUS CHARLES A, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 4, line 32 - line 52; examples IV,XIV; claims 1-4; table - * * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 22 * [Y] 2,4-7,13;
 [Y]EP0902060  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0044]; examples 6-9,13-15 *;
 [Y]GB1516544  (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 2,4,13 * claim -; table - *
International search[Y]US4387176  (FRYE ROBERT B);
 [Y]JPH09151309  (DAICEL CHEM);
 [Y]JPH1192678  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND)