Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095460

EP1095460 - INTERLEAVING / DEINTERLEAVING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Min-Goo
973-3, Youngtong-dong, Paltal-gu, Suwon-shi
Kyonggi-do 442-470 / KR
02 / KIM, Beong-Jo
Mujigaemaeul 201, Kumi-dong, Puntang-gu
Songnam-shi, Kyonggi-do 463-500 / KR
03 / LEE, Young-Hwan
237-7, Chongja-dong, Puntang-gu, Songnam-shi
Kyonggi-do 463-010 / KR
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2001/18]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date00915575.503.04.2000
[2001/18]
WO2000KR00300
Priority number, dateKR1999001285802.04.1999         Original published format: KR 9912858
KR1999001179806.04.1999         Original published format: KR 9911798
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0060750
Date:12.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095460
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000
[2001/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.10.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/00, H03M13/27
[2002/12]
Former International [2001/18]H03M13/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/22]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VER- UND ENTSCHACHTELLUNGSAPPARAT UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2001/18]
English:INTERLEAVING / DEINTERLEAVING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2001/18]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ENTRELACEMENT / DESENTRELACEMENT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2001National basic fee paid 
02.01.2001Search fee paid 
12.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
01.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2005Date of oral proceedings
08.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/34]
08.09.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.04.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/34]
Appeal following examination18.11.2005Appeal received No.  T0254/06
18.01.2006Statement of grounds filed
30.04.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
30.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]  - NTT DOCOMO, "A Study on Turbo-interleaver Flexibility", TSG-RAN WORKING GROUP 1 MEETING #2, Yokahama, (199902), pages 1 - 3, XP002188363 [A] 1,6,12,17,24 * paragraph [0001] *
 [PA]  - CHI Z ET AL, "High throughput low energy FEC/ARQ technique for short frame turbo codes", 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.00CH37100), PROCEEDINGS OF 2000 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ISTANBUL, TURKEY, 5-9 JUNE 2000, 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-6293-4, pages 2653 - 2656 vol.5, XP002188364 [PA] 1,6,12,17,24 * page 2653, line 25 - line 10 *
International search[A]WO9843168  (IBM [US], et al);
 [A]US5333289  (KANEKO SEIJI [US], et al);
 [A]  - DAVID T. HARPER III ET AL., "Conflict-free vector access using a dynamic storage scheme", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, (199103), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 276 - 283, XP002965672

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.76404
 [A]  - KIN-MAN LAM ET AL., "A new storage scheme for conflict-free vector access", COMPUTER, COMMUNICATION, CONTROL AND POWER ENGINEERING PROCEEDINGS, IEEE TENCON '93, (1993), vol. 1, pages 32 - 35, XP000463223