Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159534

EP1159534 - VIBRATION-DRIVEN ACOUSTIC JET CONTROLLING BOUNDARY LAYER SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Robin Mihekun
108 Burbank Road
Ellington, CT 06029 / US
02 / Tunkel, Roman N.
Apartment 328, 35 Ginger Lane
East Hartford, CT 06118 / US
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date00915876.725.02.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000US04891
Priority number, dateUS1999025756425.02.1999         Original published format: US 257564
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0050778
Date:31.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159534
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1159534
Date:13.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:F15D1/12, B64C23/00, B64C21/04, B64C21/06, B64C27/00
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/33]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VIBRATIONSANGETRIEBENER AKUSTISCHER STRAHL, DER DIE ABLÖSUNG DER GRENZSCHICHT KONTROLLIERT[2001/49]
English:VIBRATION-DRIVEN ACOUSTIC JET CONTROLLING BOUNDARY LAYER SEPARATION[2001/49]
French:JET ACOUSTIQUE CONDUIT PAR VIBRATION ET PERMETTANT LE CONTROLE DU DECOLLEMENT DE LA COUCHE LIMITE[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2001National basic fee paid 
25.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
05.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2003Fee for grant paid
04.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4333865  (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-37 * column 3, lines 14-50 * * column 9, lines 11-57 * * figure 3A *;
 [A]DE19735269  (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1-37 * page 2, lines 25-37 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 13 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4697769  (BLACKWELDER RON F [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 12 * * claim 1 * * figures 2,5-7 *;
 [A]US4989810  (MEIER HANS U [DE], et al) [A] 1-37 * column 2, lines 36-45 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 32 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0887257  (UNIV RAMOT [IL]) [A] 1-37 * column 8, lines 27-38 * * figures 2A,,2B *;
 [AP]US5938404  (DOMZALSKI DAVID B [US], et al) [AP] 1-37 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 4 * * figure 1 *