Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1259863

EP1259863 - STRUCTURE OF DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (DRM) SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2016  [2016/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PEINADO, Marcus
5007 - 148th Avenue N.E. E207
Bellevue, WA 98007 / US
02 / ABBURI, Rajasekhar
7844 NE 10th Street
Medina, WA 98039 / US
03 / BELL, Jeffrey, R., C.
107 N. 67th Street
Seattle, WA 98013 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00915912.025.02.2000
[2002/48]
WO2000US05091
Priority number, dateUS19990126614P27.03.1999         Original published format: US 126614 P
US1999029036312.04.1999         Original published format: US 290363
US2000048293213.01.2000         Original published format: US 482932
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0058811
Date:05.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1259863
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/48]
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR EINES SYSTEMS ZUM VERWALTEN VON DIGITALEN RECHTEN[2002/48]
English:STRUCTURE OF DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT (DRM) SYSTEM[2002/48]
French:STRUCTURE DE SYSTEME DE GESTION DES DROITS DE CONTENUS NUMERIQUES[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2001National basic fee paid 
13.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/48]
15.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/35]
15.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9809209  (INTERTRUST TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-58 * page 51, line 5 - page 59, line 13 * * page 74, line 10 - page 77, line 14 * * page 102, line 3 - page 104, line 19 * * page 147, line 6 - page 149, line 21 * * page 166, line 8 - page 172, line 18 * * page 174, line 10 - page 179, line 13 * * page 180, line 20 - page 195, line 10 * * page 198, line 7 - page 199, line 19 * * page 204, line 5 - line 20 * * page 241, line 9 - page 246, line 6 * * page 257, line 20 - page 258, line 6 * * page 262, line 6 - line 19 * * page 267, line 19 - page 275, line 13 * * page 284, line 13 - page 287, line 22 * * page 334, line 10 - page 337, line 9 * * page 375, line 7 - page 390, line 14 * * page 393, line 18 - page 420, line 17 * * page 432, line 14 - page 436, line 5 * * page 438, line 8 - page 443, line 17 * * page 456, line 23 - page 462, line 11 * * page 466, line 13 - page 468, line 17 * * page 471, line 7 - page 474, line 2 * * page 497, line 9 - page 506, line 10 * * page 537, line 5 - page 542, line 16 * * page 577, line 1 - page 581, line 17 * * page 598, line 9 - page 645, line 18 * * page 666, line 4 - page 669, line 6 * * page 678, line 15 - page 685, line 23 * * page 720, line 4 - line 17 * * page 728, line 14 - page 732, line 15 * * page 811, line 1 - page 812, line 9 * * page 830, line 1 - page 835, line 2 * * page 907, line 8 - page 922, line 7 * * page 929, line 16 - page 941, line 13 *;
 [X]EP0715245  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-58 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - line 37 * * page 5, line 17 - line 29 * * page 6, line 46 - line 57 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 30 * * page 15, line 43 - line 56 * * page 25, line 35 - page 26, line 34 *