Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161192

EP1161192 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING POST-SURGICAL COMPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.04.2006  [2006/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ntero Surgical, Inc.
1137D San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[2001/50]
Inventor(s)01 / BOMMANNAN, D., Bommi
1977 Wimbledon Place
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
02 / LAUFER, Michael, D.
1259 El Camino Real, 211
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2002/15]
Former [2001/50]01 / BOMMANNAN, D., Bommi
2535 Betlo Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / LAUFER, Michael, D.
1259 El Camino Real, 211
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
Representative(s)Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date00916416.116.03.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000US06949
Priority number, dateUS1999027126817.03.1999         Original published format: US 271268
US1999038836301.09.1999         Original published format: US 388363
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0054682
Date:21.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161192
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/04
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND METHODEN ZUR REDUKTION POSTCHIRURGISCHER KOMPLIKATIONEN[2001/50]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING POST-SURGICAL COMPLICATIONS[2001/50]
French:SYSTEMES ET TECHNIQUES PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LES COMPLICATIONS POSTOPERATOIRES[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2001National basic fee paid 
11.10.2001Search fee paid 
11.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
01.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/16]
08.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200304   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2003
31.03.200405   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2004
31.03.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5779699  (LIPSON DAVID [US]);
 [X]US5846235  (PASRICHA PANKAJ JAY [US], et al);
 [X]US5711958  (COHN DANIEL [IL], et al)