Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162972

EP1162972 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.03.2017  [2017/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Durect Corporation
10240 Bubb Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Randolph, Mellus
423 Wave Avenue
Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US
02 / THEEUWES, Felix
27350 Altamont Road
Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00916460.916.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US07068
Priority number, dateUS19990125589P18.03.1999         Original published format: US 125589 P
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0054745
Date:21.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162972
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4468, A61K9/70, A61F13/02, A61M5/00
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR SCHMERZBEKÄMPFUNG[2001/51]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT[2001/51]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET METHODES UTILISES POUR SOULAGER LA DOULEUR[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2001National basic fee paid 
12.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
08.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/10]
02.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201617   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9936071  (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [XP] 1-5,11-14,16-22,27-38,41-46 * abstract * * page 11, line 21 - line 23; claim - *;
 [X]WO9749391  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15,20-22,27-30,36-41,43-47 * abstract * * page 8, line 7 - line 10 * * page 8, line 28 - line 30 * * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 1; claims 1,5 *;
 [X]WO9851246  (ELKHOURY GEORGE F [US]) [X] 1-6,10,11,13,16-18,20-22,26-29,31-34,36-38,41-45 * abstract * * page 8, line 22 - line 30 * * page 9, line 21 - line 22 * * page 10, line 5 - line 9 * * page 10, line 23 - line 28 * * page 17, line 8 - line 30 *;
 [X]US5672167  (ATHAYDE AMULYA L [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,23-25 * abstract * * column 13, line 5 *;
 [A]US5660854  (HAYNES DUNCAN H [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5633000  (GROSSMAN STUART A [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * the whole document *
Examination WO9639222
  WO9639224
  WO9749402