Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163724

EP1163724 - COMPENSATION CIRCUIT FOR DRIVER CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / FRIEBE, Dirk
Rosenheimer Strasse 205
D-81671 München / DE
02 / SANDERS, Anthony
Blutenburgstrasse 17
D-80636 München / DE
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Barth, Stephan Manuel
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Barth, Stephan Manuel, Dr.
Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner Gbr, Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date00916775.001.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000DE00592
Priority number, dateDE199911035209.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910352
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0054408
Date:14.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163724
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1163724
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03K19/003
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/36]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMPENSATIONSSCHALTUNG FÜR TREIBERSCHALTUNGEN[2001/51]
English:COMPENSATION CIRCUIT FOR DRIVER CIRCUITS[2001/51]
French:CIRCUIT DE COMPENSATION POUR CIRCUITS D'ATTAQUE[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2001National basic fee paid 
05.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
30.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2002Fee for grant paid
27.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.09.2002
[2007/35]
Cited inInternational search[X]US5111081  (ATALLAH FRANCOIS I [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5703517  (HOUSTON THEODORE W [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 7, lines 8-51; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0765037  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0714167  (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5539341  (KUO JAMES R [US]) [A] 1,9 * figures 5,6,16 *