Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161799

EP1161799 - TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MOLIERE, Thomas
Johann-Fichte-Strasse 11/13
D-80805 München / DE
 [2001/50]
Application number, filing date00916789.101.03.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000DE00614
Priority number, dateDE199911114712.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19911147
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0055981
Date:21.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161799
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1161799
Date:28.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/40
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/35]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SENDEEMPFÄNGER[2001/50]
English:TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER[2001/50]
French:EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2001National basic fee paid 
13.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2002Fee for grant paid
18.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US5291474  (IKONEN RAIMO [FI], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0535800  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * abstract *