Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080298

EP1080298 - OIL SEPARATOR FOR REMOVING OIL FROM THE CRANKCASE VENTILATION GASES OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hengst SE & Co. KG
Nienkamp 55-85
48147 Münster / DE
[2014/11]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
Hengst GmbH & Co. KG
Nienkamp 75
48147 Münster / DE
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG
Nienkamp 75
48147 Münster / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BUSEN, Jürgen
Hessenweg 84
D-48683 Ahaus / DE
02 / PIETSCHNER, Sieghard
Taubenstrasse 6
D-48268 Greven / DE
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2018/35]
Former [2011/13]Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2007/16]Altenburg, Udo , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2003/40]Schulze Horn, Kathrin
Schulze Horn & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Goldstrasse 50
48147 Münster / DE
Former [2001/10]Schulze Horn & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Goldstrasse 50
48147 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date00916937.614.03.2000
[2001/10]
WO2000EP02230
Priority number, dateDE1999101227118.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19912271
[2001/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0057038
Date:28.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080298
Date:07.03.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080298
Date:30.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/31]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1080298
Date:29.08.2018
Language:DE
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F01M13/00, F01M13/04
[2017/47]
Former International [2001/10]F01M13/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2018/35]
Former [2003/31]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  SE 
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:ÖLABSCHEIDER ZUR ENTÖLUNG VON KURBELGEHÄUSE-ENTLÜFTUNGSGASEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2001/10]
English:OIL SEPARATOR FOR REMOVING OIL FROM THE CRANKCASE VENTILATION GASES OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2001/10]
French:DESHUILEUR DESTINE A DESHUILER LES GAZ D'AERATION DU CARTER D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2000National basic fee paid 
17.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
18.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2003Fee for grant paid
21.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.07.2009  WITHDRAWN
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Seyboth, Matthias
Mann+Hummel International GmbH & Co. KG
Schwieberdinger Straße 126
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  WITHDRAWN
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  15.10.2009  WITHDRAWN
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater, et al
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/52]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.07.2009  WITHDRAWN
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Seyboth, Matthias
Mann+Hummel International GmbH & Co. KG
Patentabteilung
Hindenburgstraße 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  WITHDRAWN
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  15.10.2009  WITHDRAWN
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater, et al
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2012/10]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.07.2009  WITHDRAWN
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Seyboth, Matthias
Mann+Hummel GmbH Patentabteilung VR-P Hindenburgstraße 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  15.10.2009  WITHDRAWN
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/51]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.07.2009  WITHDRAWN
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  15.10.2009  WITHDRAWN
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Bongen, Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/49]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.07.2009  WITHDRAWN
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  15.10.2009  WITHDRAWN
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Bongen, Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.07.2009  WITHDRAWN
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann + Hummel GmbH, Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  15.10.2009  WITHDRAWN
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Bongen, Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/33]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.07.2009  WITHDRAWN
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann + Hummel GmbH, Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft, Rotermund + Pfusch + Bernard, et al
Waiblinger Strasse 11
70372 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2006/37]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann + Hummel GmbH, Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 03  29.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft, Rotermund + Pfusch + Bernard, et al
Waiblinger Strasse 11
70372 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2004/27]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann + Hummel GmbH, Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
Tragsdorf, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 3
06844 Dessau / DE
 03  29.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstr. 54
D-70376 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft, Rotermund + Pfusch + Bernard, et al
Waiblinger Strasse 11
70372 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2004/25]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann + Hummel GmbH, Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 02  24.04.2004  07.05.2004  ADMISSIBLE
POLYTEC AUTOMOTIVE GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Opponent's representative
Tragsdorf, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 3
06844 Dessau / DE
Former [2004/22]
Opponent(s)01  27.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
MANN + HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Voth, Gerhard
Mann + Hummel GmbH, Hindenburgstr. 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
01.12.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.06.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.09.2006Date of oral proceedings
15.09.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2012Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.08.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
14.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2017
27.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.12.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.04.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.07.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition21.10.2014Appeal received No.  T2103/14
23.12.2014Statement of grounds filed
29.11.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
17.11.2006Appeal received No.  T1755/06
24.01.2007Statement of grounds filed
20.12.2007Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
20.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
31.08.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2378632  (HOOKER JR CHARLES L, et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE4214324  (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4816156  (BROMBACH HANSJOERG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 51; figure - *;
 [A]DE3909402  (SCHUMACHER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5660607  (JOKSCHAS GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *
by applicantDE4214324