Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159154

EP1159154 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A SUPPLEMENTARY MAT IN AN AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2009Change - representativepublished on 07.10.2009  [2009/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saxonia-Franke GmbH & Co
Kuhnbergstrasse 1
73037 Göppingen / DE
For all designated states
JUBA Jutta Baumgartner GmbH
Altenburger Strasse 7
04610 Meuselwitz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/27]For all designated states
SAXONIA-FRANKE GMBH & CO.
Kuhnbergstrasse 1
D-73037 Göppingen / DE
For all designated states
JUBA Jutta Baumgartner GmbH
Altenburger Strasse 7
04610 Meuselwitz / DE
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
SAXONIA-FRANKE GMBH & CO.
Kuhnbergstrasse 1
D-73037 Göppingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / AUGSPRUNG, Erich
Zeppelinstrasse 48
D-73312 Geislingen/Steige / DE
02 / BAUMGARTNER, Michael
Hauptstrasse 37
85567 Grafing / DE
 [2002/27]
Former [2001/49]01 / AUGSPRUNG, Erich
Zeppelinstrasse 48
D-73312 Geislingen/Steige / DE
Representative(s)von Puttkamer, Nikolaus , et al
VP-IP von Puttkamer Berngruber
Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von
Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Türkenstrasse 9
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/41]von Puttkamer, Nikolaus , et al
Patentanwälte Haft, von Puttkamer Berngruber, Karakatsanis Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Former [2002/27]von Puttkamer, Nikolaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Former [2001/49]von Puttkamer, Nikolaus , et al
Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Application number, filing date00916964.016.03.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000EP02357
Priority number, dateDE199911195917.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19911959
DE199915511816.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19955118
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0055007
Date:21.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159154
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60N3/04
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER ZUSATZMATTE IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2001/49]
English:DEVICE FOR FIXING A SUPPLEMENTARY MAT IN AN AUTOMOBILE[2001/49]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FIXER UN TAPIS SUPPLEMENTAIRE DANS UN VEHICULE[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2001National basic fee paid 
04.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
22.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAY]JPH06320995  (DAIWA KK, et al) [X] 1-4,20 * figures 1-5 * [A] 9 [Y] 11,14,28;
 JPH06320995  [ ];
 [YA]JPS638034  (YAMATO CO LTD) [Y] 11,14 * figures 1-6 * [A] 1,12,13;
 JPS638034  [ ];
 [YA]DE3405490  (GOLNIK KONRAD) [Y] 28 * column A; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,3;
 [AD]DE29609513U  (ADOLF BECK GMBH & CO KUNSTSTOF [DE]) [AD] 1 * column A; figures 1-16 *;
 [AP]EP0919430  (FABRICATION D ACCESSOIRES DE C [FR]) [AP] 1 * column A; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE29611827U  (STIDSEN POUL [DK]);
 [A]EP0188639  (HERMANN OTTO WILHELM);
 [A]DE8903993U  (GUMAR KUNSTSTOFF)
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 2, [ ] * abstract *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880614), vol. 012, no. 206, Database accession no. (M - 708), [ ] * abstract *
by applicantDE29609513U