Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098110

EP1098110 - TRANSMISSION BELT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bando Chemical Industries, Ltd.
2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 652-0883 / JP
[2007/11]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
BANDO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIMOTO, Hiroshi, Bando Chem. Ind. Ltd.
2-15 Meiwadori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP
02 / FUJIWARA, Katuyoshi, Bando Chem. Ind. Ltd.
2-15 Meiwadori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date00917339.417.04.2000
[2001/19]
WO2000JP02511
Priority number, dateJP1112044199919.04.1999         Original published format: JP 1112441999
[2006/31]
Former [2001/19]JP1999011124419.04.1999
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0063581
Date:26.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098110
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098110
Date:14.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.10.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:F16G5/06, B29D29/10, C08J5/12, D06M15/693
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/22]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:TREIBRIEMEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2001/19]
English:TRANSMISSION BELT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2001/19]
French:COURROIE DE TRANSMISSION ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2001Translation filed 
15.01.2001National basic fee paid 
15.01.2001Search fee paid 
15.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
21.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2006Fee for grant paid
22.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08]
Request for further processing for:08.11.2005Request for further processing filed
08.11.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.11.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR14.03.2007
GB14.06.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/24]GB14.06.2007
FR02.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5807634  (PELTON DANIEL A [US]) [Y] 1,4,7-10 * claims 1-4,9 * * column 1, line 17 - line 22 * * column 4, line 27 - line 31 * * example 1 *;
 [Y]US3775158  (GALLAGHER G, et al) [Y] 1,4,7-10 * claims 1-6 * * column 1, line 14 - line 21 *;
 [Y]US4285756  (ELMER OTTO C) [Y] 1,4,7-10 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 48 - line 52 * * column 6, line 39 - line 46 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 18 * * column 7, line 67 - column 9, line 34 *
International search[Y]JPH06346948  (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD);
 [Y]JPS62205131  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS6099184  (SEITETSU KAGAKU CO LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPS59125975  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO, et al);
 [Y]JPH0116546  ;
 [A]JPH109345  (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD);
 [A]EP0688810  (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]);
 [A]EP0685661  (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]);
 [A]JPS5989375  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK)