EP1185374 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDICATING AN UNDESIRED OPERATION CONDITION OF A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA LAVAL AB 147 80 Tumba / SE | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELLDEN, Lars, Hakan S:t Paulsgatan 33A S-118 48 Stockholm / SE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Rosenquist, Per Olof Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Rosenquist, Per Olof Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00917543.1 | 03.03.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000SE00424 | Priority number, date | SE19990000815 | 08.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9900815 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053331 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185374 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185374 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B04B13/00, B04B1/08, B04B11/04 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B04B1/08 (EP,US);
B04B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
B04B11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anzeige eines unerwünschten Betriebszustandes in einer Zentrifugal-Trennvorrichtung | [2002/11] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INDICATING AN UNDESIRED OPERATION CONDITION OF A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | [2002/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL INDIQUANT UN ETAT DE FONCTIONNEMENT NON DESIRE DANS UN SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | GB | 03.03.2009 | IE | 03.03.2009 | LU | 03.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.03.2009 | ||
LU | 03.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
GB | 03.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | PT | 30.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10272383 ; | JPH10272383 [ ]; | [A]US4206871 (NILSSON VILGOT R [SE]); | [A]US4410318 (BJOERK JOHAN E G [SE], et al); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19981013), vol. 98, no. 51, Database accession no. 1998-602336, XP002905235 & JPH10272383 A 20000627 (MITSUBISHI KAKOKI KAISHA LTD) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP10272383 A 19981013 (MITSUBISHI KAKOKI KAISHA) |