Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162920

EP1162920 - PLACEMENT GUIDE FOR ABLATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.09.2010  [2010/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endocare, Inc.
7 Studebaker
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / MIKUS, Paul, W.
53 Coastal Oak
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US
02 / EUM, Jay, J.
5 Mistral
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/24]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2006/25]Akers, Noel James , et al
Howrey Simon Arnold & White Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein I 31st Floor
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Former [2001/51]Akers, Noel James
Howrey Simon Arnold & White, CityPoint, One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
Application number, filing date00917815.308.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US06155
Priority number, dateUS1999027288919.03.1999         Original published format: US 272889
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0056239
Date:28.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162920
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.09.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/18
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
TitleGerman:PLAZIERHILFE FÜR ABLATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN[2001/51]
English:PLACEMENT GUIDE FOR ABLATION DEVICES[2001/51]
French:GUIDE DE MISE EN PLACE POUR DISPOSITIFS D'ABLATION[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase24.09.2001National basic fee paid 
24.09.2001Search fee paid 
24.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
30.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/36]
20.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201011   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5390661  (GRIFFITH JIM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 3; figures 3-7 *;
 [X]EP0694284  (DRAEGER MED ELECTRONICS BV [NL]) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 36; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4223897  (DAUM WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE19539775  (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE9312792U  (MAN CERAMICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0178464  (XINTEC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 34; figures 15,16 *
International search[A]US5873815  (KERIN JOHN [AU], et al);
 [A]US5390661  (GRIFFITH JIM [US], et al);
 [A]US5800493  (STEVENS GAIL [US], et al)