EP1161628 - FUEL INJECTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Motor Corporation of America 6545 U.S. 1 Grant, FL 32494 / US | [2002/47] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Outboard Marine Corporation 100 Sea-Horse Drive Waukegan, Illinois 60085-2195 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADUE, Martin, L. 2008 87th Place Kenosha, WI 53143 / US | 02 /
PARRISH, Scott, E. Apartment 7, 5846 80th Street Kenosha, WI 53142 / US | 03 /
PELTIER, Daniel, E. 7308 31th Avenue Kenosha, WI 53142 / US | 04 /
HELLMICH, Wolfram Von-der-Vring-Strasse 16 D-81929 München / DE | [2002/09] |
Former [2001/50] | 01 /
RADUE, Martin, L. 2008 87th Place Kenosha, WI 53143 / US | ||
02 /
PARRISH, Scott, E. Apartment 7, 5846 80th Street Kenosha, WI 53142 / US | |||
03 /
PELTIER, Daniel, E. 7308 31th Avenue Kenosha, WI 53142 / US | |||
04 /
HELLMICH, Wolfram Freischützstrasse 110 D-81927 München / DE | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Solf, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00917957.3 | 13.03.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000US06779 | Priority number, date | US19990268077 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: US 268077 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053922 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161628 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/08, F02M61/16 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
F02M61/168 (EP,US);
B24B15/02 (EP,US);
F02M61/08 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49432 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/50] | English: | FUEL INJECTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2001/50] | French: | INJECTEUR POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET SON PROCEDE DE REALISATION | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/04] | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5353991 (DE NAGEL STEPHEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,10,11 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 20 * * figures 4-6 * [Y] 6,7,12-15,17,20; | [Y]US5685492 (DAVIS ROBERT MAX [AU], et al) [Y] 6,7,12-15,17,20 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 9 * * figure - *; | [XA]DE880822 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,11 * page 2, line 25 - line 77 * * figure - * [A] 17,20 |