Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162962

EP1162962 - ALKYNYL ARYL SULFONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LONZA INC.
17-17 Route 208
Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
LONZA INC.
17-17 Route 208
Fair Lawn New Jersey 07410 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NIRCHIO, Peter, C.
65 Welsh Road
Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Riegler, Norbert Hermann
Lonza AG
Patentabteilung
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]Riegler, Norbert Hermann
Lonza AG Patentabteilung Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2001/51]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street
Leeds LS2 8DD / GB
Application number, filing date00918034.016.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US06990
Priority number, dateUS19990125290P19.03.1999         Original published format: US 125290 P
US1999040065421.09.1999         Original published format: US 400654
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0056305
Date:28.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162962
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162962
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.09.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/10, C07C317/06, C07C317/14, C07C317/22
[2002/43]
Former International [2001/51]A61K31/10, C07C317/06, C07C317/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ALKYNYL ARYL SULFONE[2001/51]
English:ALKYNYL ARYL SULFONES[2001/51]
French:SULFONE D'ALKYNYLE ARYLE[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2001National basic fee paid 
28.09.2001Search fee paid 
28.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
30.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2004Fee for grant paid
24.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47]
Request for further processing for:21.11.2003Request for further processing filed
21.11.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.12.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
FR01.12.2004
IT01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
SE01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
CY16.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
IE16.03.2005
LU16.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
PT01.05.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
FR01.12.2004
IT01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
SE01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
CY16.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
IE16.03.2005
LU16.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/26]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
FR01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
SE01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
CY16.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
IE16.03.2005
LU16.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/20]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
FR01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
SE01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
CY16.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
IE16.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/08]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
FR01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
SE01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
IE16.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/31]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
FR01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
IE16.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/23]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
IE16.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/13]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
NL01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
DE02.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
GB16.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
DK01.03.2005
GR01.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT01.12.2004
BE01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
GR01.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT01.12.2004
CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
GR01.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
Former [2005/27]CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
GR01.03.2005
ES12.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
GR01.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH01.12.2004
FI01.12.2004
LI01.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI01.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US3268391  (BAKER DON R, et al) [A] 40-43 *column 1*;
 [A]US2959517  (BOWERS JAMES B, et al) [A] 40-43 *column 1 and the claim*;
 JPS5046833  [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO.)
 [X]  - ZHANG, CH; BALLAY II, CH AND TRUDELL, L., "2-Bromoethynyl aryl sulfones as versatile dienophiles; a formal synthesis of epibatidine", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1: ORGANIC AND BIO-ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 6, pages 675 - 676, XP002209423 [X] 1,4,7,9,11,12,15,16,23,24,28-30,38 *column 1; especially, scheme 1*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a900970a
 [X]  - BHATTACHARYA, SOMENDRA N. ET AL, "Friedel-Crafts sulfonylation of bis(trimethylsilyl)acetylene;a useful route to aryl ethynyl sulfones", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 75:36214, URL: STN, XP002209424 [X] 15,16,32-34,37 * abstract *
    [] - ORGANOMETAL. CHEM. SYN. (1971), 1(2), 145-9,
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. rid 4129691, XP002209425 [X] 39 * abstract *
    [] - BHATTACHARYA, S.N. ET AL., OMCSAW, ORGANOMET. CHEM. SYNTH; EN;1;1970/1971;145-149,
 [A]  - MATSUMOTO KOSAKU, "SULFONES FOR THE POTENTIATION OF FUNGICIDES", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (1975), vol. 83, no. 11, ISSN 0009-2258, XP002175320 [A] 40-43
International search[A]US4559082  (FELIX RAYMOND A [US], et al)
 [A]  - OTTEN A. ET AL., "Chemistry in the ambient field of the alkaloid epibatidine. part 1.2-(Het)aryl-asubstituted 7-azabicyclo(2.2.1)heptane systems", DATABASE CAPLUS ON STN,, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (COLUMBUS, OHIO, USA),
    [] - EUR. J. ORG. CHEM.,, (1998), vol. 9, pages 1997 - 2001,
 [A]  - WILLIAMSON B., "Preparation, molecular structure and Diels-Alder cycloaddition chemistry of .beta.-functionalized alkynyl(phenyl)iodonium salts", DATABASE CAPLUS ON STN,, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS (COLUMBUS, OHIO, USA),
    [] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC.,, (199307), vol. 115, no. 7, pages 2590 - 2597,