Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1088433

EP1088433 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURE DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Change - designated statespublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microvault Corp.
17011 Beach Boulevard, 900
Huntington Beach, CA 92697 / US
[2001/14]
Inventor(s)01 / SHMELEV, Alexander, V.
992 Noria Street
Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US
 [2001/14]
Representative(s)Miller, James Lionel Woolverton , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/14]Miller, James Lionel Woolverton , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date00919529.822.03.2000
[2001/14]
WO2000US07588
Priority number, dateUS19990125437P22.03.1999         Original published format: US 125437 P
[2001/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0057613
Date:28.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1088433
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000
[2001/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2001/14]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2001/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN GESICHERTES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM[2001/14]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURE DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM[2001/14]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SECURISER UN SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES[2001/14]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2000National basic fee paid 
22.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
05.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0679978  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,9-11,17-19,25-27 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 31 - line 37 * * page 3, column 4, line 34 - page 4, column 5, line 23 * * page 14, column 25, line 8 - column 26, line 34 * * page 19, column 36, line 39 - page 20, column 37, line 14; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US5805702  (CURRY STEPHEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 49 * * column 3, line 29 - line 46 * * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 23 *