EP1163019 - MEDICAL DEVICES AND APPLICATIONS OF POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METABOLIX, INC. 21 Erie Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2007/43] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Metabolix, Inc. 21 Erie Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states METABOLIX, INC. 2nd Floor, 303 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142-1196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Simon, F. 22 Cider Hill Lane Sherborn, MA 01770 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, David, P. 33 Hemlock Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
SKRALY, Frank 60 Raymond Avenue Somerville, MA 02144 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/04] | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Simon, F. 22 Cider Hill Lande Sherbon, MA 01770 / US | ||
02 /
MARTIN, David, P. 33 Hemlock Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
03 /
SKRALY, Frank 60 Raymond Avenue Somerville, MA 02144 / US | |||
Former [2001/51] | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Simon, F. 28 Deerfield Road Sherbon, MA 01770 / US | ||
02 /
MARTIN, David, P. 33 Hemlock Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
03 /
SKRALY, Frank 60 Raymond Avenue Somerville, MA 02144 / US | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/51] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00919621.3 | 24.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US07890 | Priority number, date | US19990126180P | 25.03.1999 Original published format: US 126180 P | US19990142238P | 02.07.1999 Original published format: US 142238 P | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056376 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163019 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163019 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/14, A61L17/12, A61L27/18, A61L27/58, A61L31/06 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61L17/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
C08G63/06 (EP,US);
C08J9/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/0033 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C12P7/625 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61L2300/00 (EP,US);
C08J2201/0444 (EP,US);
C08J2201/0482 (EP,US);
C08J2367/04 (EP,US);
Y10S606/911 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/0033, C08L67/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN VON POLYHYDROXYALKANOATPOLYMEREN | [2001/51] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICES AND APPLICATIONS OF POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE POLYMERS | [2001/51] | French: | UTILISATIONS ET APPLICATIONS MEDICALES DE POLYMERES DE POLYHYDROXYALCANOATE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 30.01.2002 | Observations by third parties | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07075835.4 / EP1867348 | EP10075553.7 / EP2305324 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0628586 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12,22,30-32,34 * claim - * * example - *; | [X]US5480394 (ISHIKAWA KENJI [JP]) [X] 1-5,22,30-32,34 * example - * * table 3 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0754467 (ASTRA AB [SE]) [X] 1-5,25,27,30-32,34 * claim - *; | [DX]WO9707153 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL [US], et al) [DX] 1-7,11,30,31,33,34 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 10 * * claim - *; | [DX]WO9848028 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [DX] 1-12,17-21 * claim - *; | [DX]WO9851812 (METABOLIX INC [US]) [DX] 1-34 * examples 15-24 * * claim - *; | [PX]WO9932536 (METABOLIX INC [US]) [PX] 1-34 * examples 4-6 ** claim - *; | [X] - C W POUTON ET AL, "Biosynthetic polyhydroxyalkanoates and their potential in drug delivery", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS,NL,AMSTERDAM, (1996), vol. 18, no. 18, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 133 - 162, XP002101840 [X] 1-34 * abstract * * page 143, column 1, line 13 - page 143, column 2, line 35 * * page 148, column 1, line 3 - page 149, column 1, line 3 * * page 150, column 1, line 11 - page 155, column 2, line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-409X(95)00092-L | [X] - A KISHIDA ET AL, "Formulation-assisted biodegradable polymer matrices", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN,JP,PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO, (1989), vol. 37, no. 7, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1954 - 1956, XP002101838 [X] 1-4,6-8,17-24 * the whole document * |