Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163122

EP1163122 - FUEL TANK FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 07.03.2007  [2007/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG
Kautexstrasse 52
53229 Bonn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG.
Kautexstrasse 52
53229 Bonn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WALTER, Rüdiger
Karl-Leisner-Str. 10
D-53123 Bonn / DE
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date00920391.014.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000DE00790
Priority number, dateDE199911264220.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19912642
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0056564
Date:28.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163122
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1163122
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K15/077
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
TitleGerman:KRAFTSTOFFTANK FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2001/51]
English:FUEL TANK FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE[2001/51]
French:RESERVOIR A CARBURANT POUR UN VEHICULE[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2001National basic fee paid 
26.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
01.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.09.2002Fee for grant paid
25.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
AT14.03.2003
CY14.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
[2007/10]
Former [2005/02]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
AT14.03.2003
CY14.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
Former [2004/44]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
AT14.03.2003
CY14.03.2003
Former [2004/31]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
AT14.03.2003
Former [2004/01]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/43]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT27.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[PXAY]EP0922603  (MARWAL SYSTEMS [FR]) [PX] 1,4,7-10,12,14 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 22 - line 25 * * column 5, line 10 - line 26 * * column 6, line 16 - line 18 * * column 7, line 29 - line 37 * [A] 15,20,21 [Y] 11,13;
 [Y]EP0803394  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 19 - line 25; figure 3 *;
 [Y]DE19600872  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 13 * column 4, line 1 - line 7; figure 5 *;
 [A]DE19605703  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 4,5,15-17;
 [A]EP0629522  (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 7,8,14 * column 1, line 45 - line 57 *